EP3793073 - PERMANENT MAGNET MOTOR, COMPRESSOR, AND AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Meizhi Compressor Co., Ltd. Shunfengshan Industrial Development Zone Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528333 / CN | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAO, Zhengzhong Shunfengshan Industrial Development Zone, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528333 / CN | 02 /
MAO, Linshu Shunfengshan Industrial Development Zone, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528333 / CN | 03 /
QIU, Xiaohua Shunfengshan Industrial Development Zone, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528333 / CN | 04 /
XU, Fei Shunfengshan Industrial Development Zone, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528333 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Yulong Shunfengshan Industrial Development Zone, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528333 / CN | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Lam, Alvin, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18927601.7 | 16.11.2018 | [2021/11] | WO2018CN115876 | Priority number, date | CN201821213287U | 27.07.2018 Original published format: CN 201821213287 U | CN201810843967 | 27.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810843967 | [2021/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020019588 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793073 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/14, H02K1/27 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
H02K1/27 (EP,KR);
H02K21/14 (EP,KR);
H02K1/165 (US);
H02K1/02 (US);
H02K1/145 (KR);
H02K1/16 (KR);
H02K3/12 (KR);
H02K3/18 (US);
H02K3/28 (US);
H02K2213/03 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | H02K21/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | PERMANENTMAGNETMOTOR, VERDICHTER UND KLIMAANLAGE | [2021/11] | English: | PERMANENT MAGNET MOTOR, COMPRESSOR, AND AIR CONDITIONER | [2021/11] | French: | MOTEUR À AIMANT PERMANENT, COMPRESSEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2020 | Translation filed | 10.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 30.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6979924 (NISHIYAMA NORIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2013026088 (NEWSOUTH INNOVATIONS PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]JP2015002650 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [YA]CN105099113 (GUANGDONG MIDEA TOSHIBA COMPRESSOR CORP, et al); | [IY]US9712008 (OMBACH GRZEGORZ [DE], et al); |