EP3829233 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE, EQUIPMENT, SYSTEM AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yajun No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/22] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 18927652.0 | 27.07.2018 | [2021/22] | WO2018CN97422 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020019296 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829233 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3829233 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/0446, H04W72/0453, H04W72/20 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04W72/1273 (US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, AUSRÜSTUNG, SYSTEM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/22] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE, EQUIPMENT, SYSTEM AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF, ÉQUIPEMENT, SYSTÈME, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2021 | Translation filed | 23.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 01.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2017064712 (HUANG WEICAI [CN], et al); | [YA]US2017079033 (LIN YINGPEI [CN], et al); | International search | [A]CN106304349 (ZTE CORP); | [A]WO2017133621 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG], et al); | [A]CN107734520 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [X]CN108307413 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |