EP3833094 - USER TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEDA, Kazuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
GUO, Shaozhen c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co., Ltd. 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Lihui c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co., Ltd. 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 05 /
HOU, Xiaolin c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co., Ltd. 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 18928773.3 | 30.07.2018 | [2021/23] | WO2018JP28399 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020026291 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3833094 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, // H04L1/16, H04L1/08 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/1273 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | H04W28/04, H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | BENUTZERENDGERÄT | [2021/23] | English: | USER TERMINAL | [2021/23] | French: | TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2021 | Translation filed | 12.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017026402 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); |