EP3833127 - BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEDA, Kazuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
GUO, Shaozhen c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co., Ltd. 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Lihui c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co., Ltd. 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 05 /
HOU, Xiaolin c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co., Ltd. 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 18928804.6 | 30.07.2018 | [2021/23] | WO2018JP28400 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020026292 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3833127 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04L1/18, // H04W72/12 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/535 (US);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | H04W72/04, H04W28/04, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | BASISSTATION | [2021/23] | English: | BASE STATION | [2021/23] | French: | STATION DE BASE | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2021 | Translation filed | 12.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018019843 (PAPASAKELLARIOU ARIS [US]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0148]; figure 11 *; | [X] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Remaining issues CA and type1 HARQ-ACK codebook", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180524), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1807415_NTTDOCOMO,INC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F93/Docs, (20180524), XP051463128 [X] 1,2 * Section 4;; figure 7 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Physical layer procedures for control (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 38.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180629), vol. RAN WG1, no. V15.2.0, pages 1 - 99, XP051474490 [A] 1,2 * Section 9.2.3 * | International search | [A]JP2017092615 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [A] 1, 2* , entire text & WO 2017/078159 A1, entire text *; | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on scheduling and HARQ feedback for NR", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #88 R1- 1702486, (20170207), XP051209640 [A] 1, 2 | [A] - ZTE, "Support of HARQ-ACK bundling for MTC", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #86b R1-1609830, (20161001), XP051149857 [A] 1, 2 | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "HARQ-ACK feedback on PUSCH for TDD eIMTA", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #76 R1- 140441, (20140201), XP055683246 [A] 1, 2 |