EP3835437 - METHOD FOR TREATING MOLTEN STEEL AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang Beom 361-104, 100, Jigok-ro 211, beon-gil Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37671 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Rak Do 301-209, 6, Samheung-ro 69 beon-gil Buk-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37613 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Sang Hun 305-1802, 38, Saecheonnyeon-daero 1076 beon-gil Buk-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37621 / KR | 04 /
JEONG, Eun Ju 113-1302, 111, Bunpo-ro Nam-gu Busan 48516 / KR | 05 /
YOON, Sang Hyeon 208-1605, 40, Jangnyangjungang-ro, Buk-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37575 / KR | 06 /
HAN, Seung Min 314-203, 319, Jigok-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37671 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Wan Yi 232-1204, 294, Jigok-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37669 / KR | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 18929550.4 | 18.12.2018 | [2021/24] | WO2018KR16100 | Priority number, date | KR20180091951 | 07.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180091951 | [2021/24] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020032331 | Date: | 13.02.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835437 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C21C7/072, B22D1/00, C21C5/46, F27B3/28, F27D19/00, F27D27/00 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
C21C5/4673 (EP);
C21C7/072 (EP,KR);
B22D1/00 (EP);
B22D1/002 (EP,KR);
B22D2/006 (EP);
B22D46/00 (EP);
C21C2300/06 (EP);
C21C2300/08 (KR);
F27D2019/0068 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/24] | C21C7/072, B22D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STAHLSCHMELZE UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2021/24] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING MOLTEN STEEL AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2021/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'ACIER FONDU ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2021/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2021 | Translation filed | 01.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 25.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 15.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2910651 (SIEMENS VAI METALS TECH GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1, 3 * * claims 1, 3, 4, 6, 7 *; | [XI]US6264716 (KEMENY FRANCIS L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11 * figure 1 * * claims 1, 3 * * example 1 * * column 8, line 27 - line 30 * [I] 5,6,12-15; | [XI]KR20120028729 (DONGBU STEEL CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11 * figures 1, 2 * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] * [I] 2,5,6,10,12-15; | [XI]US2008047396 (BURTY MARC [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11 * figures 1, 2 * * claims 10, 13 * * paragraph [0010] * [I] 2,5,6,10,12-15 | International search | [XA]KR20120028729 (DONGBU STEEL CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1, 17 [A] 2-16, 18-23; | [A]KR20070038090 (ARCELOR FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-23; | [A]KR20090062188 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-23; | [A]KR100554144B [A] 1-23; | [A]KR20020032710 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-23 | by applicant | KR20020032710 | KR100696853B |