EP3838126 - BLOOD OXYGEN SATURATION-BASED EVALUATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, INTELLIGENT WEARABLE DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Coros Sports Technology Co., Ltd Room 601 & 701, Bld. 2, No. 2 Science and Technology 9 Rd. Songhsan Lake Hi-Tech Zone Dongguan, Guangdong 523808 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/32] | For all designated states Guangdong Coros Sports Technology Co., Ltd. Room 601 & 701, Bld. 2, No. 2 Science and Technology 9 Rd. Songhsan Lake Hi-Tech Zone Dongguan 523808, Guangdong / CN | ||
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Coros Sports Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd Room 201, Building A, No. 1, Qianwan 1st Road Shenzhen-Hongkong Cooperation District Qianhai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xin Room 201, Building A, No. 1, Qianwan 1st Road, Shenzhen-Hongkong Cooperation District, Qianhai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xiaohu Room 201, Building A, No. 1, Qianwan 1st Road, Shenzhen-Hongkong Cooperation District, Qianhai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Wenliang Room 201, Building A, No. 1, Qianwan 1st Road, Shenzhen-Hongkong Cooperation District, Qianhai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 04 /
TANG, Yu Room 201, Building A, No. 1, Qianwan 1st Road, Shenzhen-Hongkong Cooperation District, Qianhai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 05 /
ZUO, Hailiang Room 201, Building A, No. 1, Qianwan 1st Road, Shenzhen-Hongkong Cooperation District, Qianhai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18930322.5 | 17.08.2018 | [2021/25] | WO2018CN101092 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020034198 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838126 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/30, G16H50/20 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B5/14542 (EP,US);
A61B5/6801 (EP,US);
A61B5/7246 (EP,US);
G06Q50/22 (EP);
G16H20/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | A61B5/0205, G06Q50/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEWERTUNG DER BLUTSAUERSTOFFSÄTTIGUNG, INTELLIGENTE AM KÖRPER TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/25] | English: | BLOOD OXYGEN SATURATION-BASED EVALUATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, INTELLIGENT WEARABLE DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉVALUATION BASÉ SUR LA SATURATION EN OXYGÈNE DU SANG, DISPOSITIF PORTATIF INTELLIGENT ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2021 | Translation filed | 11.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 05.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011040156 (VIJ ASHOK K [US]) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0084] * [I] 2-10; | [XI]US2013325498 (MUZA JR STEPHEN R [US], et al) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0038] * [I] 2-10 |