EP3840317 - USER EQUIPMENT AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIOKA, Shohei c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
TAKEDA, Kazuki c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 18930500.6 | 17.08.2018 | [2021/25] | WO2018JP30583 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020035953 | Date: | 20.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3840317 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04B7/022, H04W28/16, // H04L1/00 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04B7/022 (EP);
H04L5/0046 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W72/1273 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | H04L27/26, H04B7/022, H04W28/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄT UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2021/25] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2021/25] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION RADIO | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2021 | Translation filed | 03.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018063072 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-5 * pages 2, 10, 16, 19-22 *; | [X]WO2018116788 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * see relevant passages of US member US 2019 / 380114 *; | US2019380114 [ ] (YOKOMAKURA KAZUNARI [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0118] - [0120] *; | [X] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Maintenance for PDSCH rate matching and TA", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180811), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1809430 MAINTENANCE FOR PDSCH RATE MATCHING AND TA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRAN, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94/Docs/R1%2D1809430%2Ezip, (20180811), XP051516793 [X] 1-5 * section 3 * | International search | [A]JP2013519337 [A] 1-6 * , & US 2 *; | [A]WO2014002944 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-6* , & JP 2014-7670 A & US 2015/0341949 A1 & EP 2866492 A1 & CN 104380792 A *; | [A]WO2016204546 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-6 * , & EP 3313011 A1 & KR 10-2018-0009747 A & CN 107771378 A *; | [A] - CATT, "Remaining issues on CSI-RS", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #AH1801, Rl-1800244, (20180113), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1801/Docs/R1-1800244.zip, XP051384722 [A] 1-6 | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Maintenance on Reference Signals and QCL", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #94, R1-1809504, (20180817), XP051516867 [A] 1-6 | [A] - SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS, "Remaining issues on PDSCH rate matching", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #94, R1-1808803, (20180810), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_94/Docs/R1-1808803.zip, XP051516176 [A] 1-6 |