EP3819751 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2021/19] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku 108-0075 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Risa c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC., 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 02 /
HASEGAWA, Takashi c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC., 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 03 /
OZAWA, Yuumi c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC., 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 04 /
KIMURA, Akitaka c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC., 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 05 /
YABE, Ryo c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC., 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 06 /
TSUCHIYA, Keishi c/o SONY CORPORATION, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18931291.1 | 29.08.2018 | [2021/19] | WO2018JP32034 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020044479 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819751 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/041, G06F3/01, G06F3/0481 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP);
H04M1/72403 (US);
G06F1/1626 (EP);
G06F1/1686 (EP);
G06F1/169 (EP);
G06F3/03547 (EP);
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP);
H04M1/72469 (US);
G06F2200/1636 (EP);
G06F2203/0339 (EP);
G06F2203/04803 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/19] | G06F3/0488, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/19] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2021 | Translation filed | 07.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 06.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2175344 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0050] - [0053]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0089] - [0103]; figures 8-14 *; | [X]US2011169749 (GANEY HARRISS C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,14,15 * paragraphs [0038] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0061] * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP2706447 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 8-11 * paragraphs [0107] - [0116] * * paragraph [0128] ** figures 4,8 *; | [A]US2017038957 (FENG YICHENG [CN], et al) [A] 3,14 * paragraphs [0034] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0066] * * figures 1,2,7 * | International search | [XY]JP2012174251 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1-7, 12-17 * , paragraphs [0022]-[0065], fig. 1-9, in particular, paragraphs [0038]-[0049], fig. 4-6 (Family: none) * [Y] 8-11; | [Y]JP2012194810 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 8-11 * , paragraphs [0004]-[0045], [0052]-[0061], fig. 1-5, 8 (Family: none) * | by applicant | US2013093680 |