EP3819780 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2021/19] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku 108-0075 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Risa c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 02 /
HASEGAWA, Takashi c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 03 /
NAITO, Masahiko c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 04 /
OCHI, Takayuki c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 05 /
YABE, Ryo c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 06 /
ODA, Mizuho c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 07 /
TOKUTAKE, Kenji c/o SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC. 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 08 /
TATEISHI, Chikako c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18931675.5 | 29.08.2018 | [2021/19] | WO2018JP32029 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020044478 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819780 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/00, H04M1/72454, H04W4/021, H04W4/029, H04W4/18, H04W4/21 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
H04W4/021 (EP);
H04N23/63 (US);
H04M1/72454 (EP);
H04N5/2628 (US);
H04W4/029 (EP);
H04W4/185 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/19] | G06F16/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/19] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2021 | Translation filed | 07.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 10.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009113346 (WICKRAMASURIYA JEHAN [US], et al) [A] 2,13 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0060] ** figures 1-9 *; | [XI]EP2750054 (HTC CORP [TW]) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]US2015148005 (CHAU DUC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11,15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092] * * figures 1-20 * [I] 5,9,10,12-14; | [XI]US2016352887 (NA MIN-WOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0180] - paragraph [0204] * * figures 1-21 * [I] 2-14 | International search | [A]JP2005209177 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-19 * , *; | [XY]JP2006279764 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 7, 12-19 * , [004 * [Y] 5-6, 8-11; | [A]JP2009187233 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-19* , *; | [Y]JP2012034107 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 5-6, 8 * , *; | [Y]JP2013235560 (CANON KK) [Y] 10-11 * , *; | [Y]JP2016139242 (SHARP KK) [Y] 9 * , *; | [A]WO2017146162 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * , * | by applicant | JP2012226646 |