EP3844982 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATION SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ.) 16483 Stockholm / SE | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHU, Di No. 1068 Tianshan Road West, Changning District Shanghai 200335 / CN | 02 /
LI, Tianyi No. 1068 Tianshan Road West, Changning District Shanghai 200335 / CN | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 18932128.4 | 30.08.2018 | [2021/27] | WO2018CN103235 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020042081 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844982 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W64/00 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04W64/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR STANDORTLEISTUNGEN | [2021/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOCATION SERVICES | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR DES SERVICES DE LOCALISATION | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 01.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |