EP3855464 - ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Electronic Industries Corp. 1-1-18, Okayama-higashi Shijonawate-City, Osaka 575-8585 / JP | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEZAWA, Takashi C/O SUN Electronic Industries Corp. 1-1-18, Okayama-higashi Shijonawate-City, Osaka 575-8585 / JP | 02 /
HOSOGI, Masakazu C/O SUN Electronic Industries Corp. 1-1-18, Okayama-higashi Shijonawate-City, Osaka 575-8585 / JP | 03 /
KIMACHI, Hajime C/O SUN Electronic Industries Corp. 1-1-18, Okayama-higashi Shijonawate-City, Osaka 575-8585 / JP | 04 /
NAGAIKE, Yuya C/O SUN Electronic Industries Corp. 1-1-18, Okayama-higashi Shijonawate-City, Osaka 575-8585 / JP | 05 /
ADACHI, Takahisa C/O SUN Electronic Industries Corp. 1-1-18, Okayama-higashi Shijonawate-City, Osaka 575-8585 / JP | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 18934106.8 | 20.09.2018 | [2021/30] | WO2018JP34885 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020059091 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855464 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/145, H01G9/15, H01G9/10, H01G9/035, // H01G9/02 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
H01G9/151 (EP,US);
H01G9/08 (CN);
H01G9/004 (CN);
H01G9/02 (EP,US);
H01G9/028 (US);
H01G9/035 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | H01G9/145, H01G9/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTISCHER KONDENSATOR | [2021/30] | English: | ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR | [2021/30] | French: | CONDENSATEUR ÉLECTROLYTIQUE | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2021 | Translation filed | 08.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 14.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01167965 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2006108650 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2006114540 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [XI]JP2006120830 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2007080888 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD) | International search | [A]JPH0538866U ; | [Y]JP2005209902 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al); | [Y]WO2011099261 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2014182978 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [Y]JP2018088306 (FUJIFILM CORP) | by applicant | JP2000100670 | WO2014050913 |