EP3858019 - MULTI-SLOT SCHEDULING ON UNLICENSED SPECTRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenovo (Beijing) Limited 6 Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEI, Haipeng Room 702, Building 9 Honglianbeicun Haidian District Beijing 100082 / CN | 02 /
GOLITSCHEK EDLER VON ELBWART, Alexander Bessunger Str. 5 64285 Darmstadt / DE | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 18934727.1 | 28.09.2018 | [2021/31] | WO2018CN108282 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020062011 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858019 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, // H04W74/08 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W74/0808 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHLITZPLANUNG AUF UNLIZENZIERTEM SPEKTRUM | [2021/31] | English: | MULTI-SLOT SCHEDULING ON UNLICENSED SPECTRUM | [2021/31] | French: | PLANIFICATION D'INTERVALLES MULTIPLES SUR UN SPECTRE SANS LICENCE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 03.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2020030555 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); |