EP3860173 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRATA, Akira c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2024/11] |
Former [2021/31] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18935560.5 | 25.09.2018 | [2021/31] | WO2018JP35454 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020065725 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860173 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3860173 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/90, H04W88/08, H04W24/02, H04W92/12, H04W76/11 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04W76/11 (EP);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W16/32 (US);
H04W4/90 (EP);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04W72/569 (US);
H04W8/08 (US);
H04W88/085 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W92/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | H04W4/90, H04W88/08, H04W72/12, H04W76/11, H04W24/10 | ||
Former IPC [2021/31] | H04W4/90, H04W88/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/31] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2021/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2021 | Translation filed | 25.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 26.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 21.02.2023 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 21.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010075627 (ROBERTS MICHAEL [CN], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * paragraphs [0037] - [0079] * [I] 2,4,5; | [A]US2016286385 (RYU JINSOOK [KR], et al) [A] 2,5 * paragraphs [0271] - [0287] *; | [A]US2017201871 (RYU JINSOOK [KR], et al) [A] 4 * paragraphs [0335] - [0426] *; | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "(TP for NR BL CR for TS 38.473) PWS over F1", vol. RAN WG3, no. Busan, South Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180520), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-182911 PWS_TP38.473, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20180520), XP051445409 [A] 1,3,6 * paragraphs [8.x1] , [ 9.2.x2] * | International search | [Y]WO2012108358 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [Y] 2, 5 * , paragraphs [0016]-[0026], [0049]-[0079], fig. 1, 2, 6-10 & US 2013/0295873 A1, paragraphs [0027]-[0037], [0060]-[0090], fig. 1, 2, 6-10 & JP 2012-165197 A & EP 2675197 A1 & CN 103348755 A *; | [XY]JP2014146863 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1, 3, 4, 6 * , paragraphs [0029]-[0031], [0040]-[0044], [0054]-[0056], [0067]-[0070], fig. 2, 3-1, 3-2 (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 5; | [A]JP2014158229 (SOFTBANK MOBILE CORP) [A] 1-6* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2004274693 | JP2012165197 | WO2015186291 |