EP3876651 - CONTENTION RANDOM ACCESS METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Wei No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18938572.7 | 01.11.2018 | [2021/36] | WO2018CN113410 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020087440 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876651 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3876651 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONFLIKTBASIERTES DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/36] | English: | CONTENTION RANDOM ACCESS METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE À RÉSOLUTION DE CONFLITS | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2021 | Translation filed | 11.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 28.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LU | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | MC | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
IT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LU | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SK | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LU | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LU | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - ASUSTEK, "Consideration on fallback of 2-step RACH procedure", vol. RAN WG2, no. Spokane, USA; 20170117 - 20170119, (20170117), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1700358 CONSIDERATION ON FALLBACK OF 2-STEP RACH PROCEDURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170117), XP051210937 [X] 1-3,7,8,15 * Section 2; page 1 - page 3 * [A] 4-6 | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "On Initial Access and Mobility for NR-U", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chengdu, China; 20181008 - 20181012, (20180928), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1810624_INITIAL ACCESS AND MOBILITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94b/Docs/R1%2D1810624%2Ezip, (20180928), XP051518030 [A] 9-14 * Section 3; page 2 - page 4 * |