EP3877586 - A COMPOSITION FOR USE AS PEROXIDE STABILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kemira Oyj Energiakatu 4 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhijiao c/o Kemira (Asia) Co., Ltd., Innov Tower, Block A 1801 Hongmei Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Rui c/o Kemira (Asia) Co., Ltd., Innov Tower, Block A 1801 Hongmei Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 18939737.5 | 07.11.2018 | [2021/37] | WO2018CN114403 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020093280 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877586 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/16, C01B15/037 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
D21C9/163 (EP,US);
D21C9/1036 (EP,US);
C01B15/01 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | D21C9/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS PEROXIDSTABILISATOR | [2021/37] | English: | A COMPOSITION FOR USE AS PEROXIDE STABILIZER | [2021/37] | French: | COMPOSITION DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE EN TANT QUE STABILISATEUR DE PEROXYDE | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 17.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5739393 (WAGNER PAUL [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 10 - line 13 ** claims 1-20 *; | [X]US5977053 (GROTH TORSTEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 9, line 39 - line 46 * * column 8, line 57 - line 64 * * column 10, line 50 - column 11, line 11 * * column 4, line 16 - line 18 *; | [A]US6056787 (RENNER GERD FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-14 * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 67 *; | [I]US2014202646 (JENKINS DONALD G [US], et al) [I] 1,4-10 * claims 1-23 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0052]; example 2 * * paragraphs [0047] , [ 0035] , [ 0031] *; | [A] - Dorota Kolodyńska, "Chelating Agents of a New Generation as an Alternative to Conventional Chelators for Heavy Metal Ions Removal from Different Waste Wate", intechopen, (20110101), URL: http://cdn.intechopen.com/pdfs/20357/InTech-Chelating_agents_of_a_new_generation_as_an_alternative_to_conventional_chelators_for_heavy_metal_ions_removal_from_different_waste_waters.pdf, (20130418), XP055060229 [A] 1-10 * page 344, paragraph 3.1 - page 346 * * page 346, paragraph 3.2 - page 349 * * page 341, paragraph 2.4 * |