EP3881173 - DETECTION OF PRINT MATERIAL DENSITY ABNORMALITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Michael Kenneth 11311 Chinden Blvd. Boise, Idaho 83714-0021 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18939891.0 | 12.11.2018 | [2021/38] | WO2018US60251 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101633 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881173 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, G06F3/12 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G03G15/5062 (EP,US);
G03G15/5058 (EP,US);
G03G15/0131 (EP,US);
G03G15/55 (EP);
G06K15/027 (EP);
G06K15/4065 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG VON DRUCKMATERIALDICHTEABNORMITÄTEN | [2021/38] | English: | DETECTION OF PRINT MATERIAL DENSITY ABNORMALITIES | [2021/38] | French: | DÉTECTION D'ANOMALIES DE DENSITÉ DE MATÉRIAU D'IMPRESSION | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 01.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/21] | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6505010 (IZUMIZAKI MASAMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, lines 15-20 * * column 6, line 53 - column 8, line 53 *; | [Y]US2018150010 (SONE KEITA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0075] , [0076] , [0108] , [0109] * | International search | [X]US2003085941 (TEZUKA HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0026], [0063]-[0066], [0074], [0166], fig.3, 5, 14, abstract, claim 1 *; | [A]US2011217052 (USUI MASATAKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2012019850 (TEZUKA HIROKI [JP])[A] 1-15; | [A]US2014111832 (HAYASHI KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-15 |