EP3889256 - LACTIC ACID-PRODUCING TRANSFORMANT OF BACTERIUM OF GENUS HYDROGENOPHILUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Utilization of Carbon Dioxide Institute Co., Ltd. Shibamitamori Bldg., 5-13-15 Shiba, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-0014 / JP | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUKAWA Hideaki c/o Utilization of Carbon Dioxide Institute Co. Ltd., Shibamitamori Bldg., 5-13-15 Shiba, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | 02 /
OHTANI Naoto c/o Utilization of Carbon Dioxide Institute Co. Ltd., Shibamitamori Bldg., 5-13-15 Shiba, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18941327.1 | 30.11.2018 | [2021/40] | WO2018JP44226 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020110300 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889256 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/21, C12N15/53, C12P7/56 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
C12N15/746 (EP,US);
C12N9/0006 (EP);
C12P7/56 (EP,US);
C12Y101/01027 (EP);
C12Y101/01037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | MILCHSÄUREPRODUZIERENDER TRANSFORMANT EINES BAKTERIUMS DER GATTUNG HYDROGENOPHILUS | [2021/40] | English: | LACTIC ACID-PRODUCING TRANSFORMANT OF BACTERIUM OF GENUS HYDROGENOPHILUS | [2021/40] | French: | TRANSFORMANT PRODUISANT DE L'ACIDE LACTIQUE D'UNE BACTÉRIE DU GENRE HYDROGENOPHILUS | [2021/40] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2021 | Translation filed | 12.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 15.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [EA]JPH0150912B ; | [YA]JP2013179863 (TOSOH CORP); | [XY]JP2017093465 (CENTRAL RES INST ELECTRIC POWER IND); | [Y]JP2017523778 ; | by applicant | JP2005528106 | JP2014030655 | JP2015023854 | JP2017093465 | JP2017523778 |