EP3856865 - COMPOSITE CEMENTITIOUS MATERIAL FOR CEMENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services Inc. 3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E. Houston, Texas 77032-3219 / US | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUIZ, Stephanie 17626 Seven Pines Dr. Spring, Texas 77379 / US | 02 /
PISKLAK, Thomas Jason 13023 Tall Forest Drive Cypress, Texas 77429 / US | 03 /
PEARL, JR., William Cecil 30407 Aldine Westfield Road Spring, Texas 77386 / US | 04 /
JONES, Paul Joseph 1431 W. 21st ST. Houston, Texas 77008 / US | 05 /
LEWIS, Samuel Jason 3 Dahlia Trail Spring, Texas 77382 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | McWilliams, David John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | McWilliams, David John Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18942541.6 | 03.12.2018 | [2021/31] | WO2018US63593 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020117188 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3856865 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/46, C04B28/24, C04B7/02, C04B111/00, C09K8/467 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
C04B20/1077 (EP);
C09K8/46 (US);
C04B20/008 (US);
C04B28/025 (EP);
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B28/24 (US);
C04B7/02 (US);
C09K8/467 (EP);
Y02P40/10 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B20/1077, C04B14/06, C04B14/106, C04B14/14, C04B14/18, C04B18/08, C04B18/101, C04B18/141, C04B18/162 (EP);
C04B20/1077, C04B2103/0088 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B18/08, C04B20/1077 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | C09K8/46, C04B28/24, C04B7/02, C04B111/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | ZEMENTARTIGES VERBUNDSTOFFMATERIAL FÜR ZEMENTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2021/31] | English: | COMPOSITE CEMENTITIOUS MATERIAL FOR CEMENT COMPOSITIONS | [2021/31] | French: | MATÉRIAU CIMENTAIRE COMPOSITE POUR DES COMPOSITIONS DE CIMENT | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 01.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2010095871 (PATIL RAHUL CHANDRAKANT [IN], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,13,15 * claims * [A] 4,5,14[I] 1-3,6-13,15 | International search | [A]US2010010108 (LECOLIER ERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * See claim 1. *; | [Y]US2011041737 (BEUCHLE GUENTER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,10-13,15,19-20 * See paragraphs [0002], [0030]-[0031]; and claim 1. *; | [AY]US2016084037 (BROTHERS LANCE E [US], et al) [A] 5-7,9,14,16-18 * See paragraphs [0013], [0038]; and claims 1, 3, 11, 15. * [Y] 1-4,8,10-13,15,19-20; | [A]US2017349485 (HORTA RICARDO SIMOES BAYAO [PT], et al) [A] 1-20* See claims 1-10. *; | [A]WO2018157239 (MACROCEMENT IND LTD [CA]) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1-5, 12. * |