EP3894724 - HOUSING FOR PLASTIC GEARBOX AND ASSOCIATED PLASTIC GEARBOX AND ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Hao Room 201, No. 26, Lane 145 Mudan Road, Pudong New District Shanghai 201204 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Jibo Room 302, No. 7, Lane 500 Anxi Road, Changning District Shanghai 200050 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Han No. 580, Jungong Road University of Shanghai For Science and Technology Yangpu District Shanghai 200082 / CN | 04 /
SONG, Wei Room 102, Building 20, No. 118 Zhoukang Road Pudong New District Shanghai 201318 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Jiafan Room 301, Building 627, Tongji Xincun Shanghai 200092 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 18943341.0 | 10.12.2018 | [2021/42] | WO2018CN120134 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020118493 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3894724 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/02, F16H57/031, F16H57/12, B25J9/10 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
F16H57/032 (EP,US);
B25J9/102 (EP,US);
F16D1/076 (EP);
F16D1/10 (EP);
F16H57/12 (EP);
F16H1/32 (EP,US);
F16H2057/02008 (EP);
F16H2057/02021 (EP,US);
F16H2057/02073 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | F16H57/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE FÜR KUNSTSTOFFGETRIEBE UND ZUGEHÖRIGES KUNSTSTOFFGETRIEBE UND ROBOTER | [2021/42] | English: | HOUSING FOR PLASTIC GEARBOX AND ASSOCIATED PLASTIC GEARBOX AND ROBOT | [2021/42] | French: | BOÎTIER POUR BOÎTE DE VITESSES EN PLASTIQUE ET BOÎTE DE VITESSES EN PLASTIQUE ASSOCIÉE ET ROBOT | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2004055404 (MILLS JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1,9 * figure 11 * * paragraphs [0095] - [0103] * [A] 2-7 [I] 8,10-12; | [A]CN203363083U (BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE PROD CHANGSHA) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XAI]DE202018101462U (IGUS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0071] - [0075] * [A] 2-5,8,9,12 [I] 6,7,11 |