EP3894789 - TIME-AWARE OCCUPANCY GRID MAPPING FOR ROBOTS IN DYNAMIC ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Yingzhe 8F Raycom Infotech Park Building A No. 2 Kexueyuan South Road Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Zhigang 1-1-804, 56 Yuan, Zhichun Road ZhongGuanCun Haidian District Beijing 100098 / CN | 03 /
SHI, Xuesong 8F, Raycom A, 2 Kexueyuan South Rd. Beijing 100080 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18943347.7 | 12.12.2018 | [2021/42] | WO2018CN120493 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020118545 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3894789 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/32, G05D1/02, G01S13/89, G01S17/89, G01S15/89 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
G01S13/89 (EP);
G01C21/3881 (EP,US);
G01C21/3848 (US);
G01C21/3859 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP);
G01S15/89 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | G01C21/32, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | ZEITBEWUSSTE BELEGUNGSRASTERKARTIERUNG FÜR ROBOTER IN DYNAMISCHEN UMGEBUNGEN | [2021/42] | English: | TIME-AWARE OCCUPANCY GRID MAPPING FOR ROBOTS IN DYNAMIC ENVIRONMENTS | [2021/42] | French: | MAPPAGE DE GRILLE D'OCCUPATION EN FONCTION DU TEMPS POUR ROBOTS DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS DYNAMIQUES | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 09.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018300561 (STEYER SASCHA [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI] - LUNENBURG JANNO ET AL, "A representation method based on the probability of collision for safe robot navigation in domestic environments", AUTONOMOUS ROBOTS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, vol. 42, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S10514-017-9653-X, ISSN 0929-5593, (20170812), pages 601 - 614, (20170812), XP036426396 [X] 1,3,4,7,10-12,15 * page 603, column left, line 20 - page 604, column right, line 16 * [I] 2,5,6,8,9,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10514-017-9653-x | [A] - Daniek Joubert ET AL, "Adaptive occupancy grid mapping with measurement and pose uncertainty", (20121201), URL: http://appliedmaths.sun.ac.za/~wbrink/students/DJoubert2012.pdf, XP055676698 [A] 1-15 * page 15, line 1 - page 18, line 27 * |