EP3897069 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/28] |
Former [2021/42] | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Wei No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [2024/28] |
Former [2021/42] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 18945124.8 | 28.12.2018 | [2021/42] | WO2018CN125017 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020133259 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897069 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3897069 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/30, B64C39/02, H04W60/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H04B7/18506 (EP,US);
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G08G5/0026 (EP);
G08G5/0052 (EP);
G08G5/0069 (EP);
H04W4/40 (US);
H04W48/02 (US);
H04W76/34 (EP,US);
B64U2201/20 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | H04W76/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2021/42] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2021 | Translation filed | 13.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 20.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018071453 (T MOBILE USA INC [US]); | [Y]CN108401503 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD); | US2021243602 [ ] (HONG WEI [CN]); | Examination | CN105225540 |