EP3608483 - A SET OF MODULAR TIMBER HOLLOW BRICKS WITH THERMAL INSULATION PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSTRACT Eko Domy Sp. z o.o. Waldyki 23A 14-229 Rozental / PL | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wasniewski, Kacper Lubajny 135 14-100 Ostroda / PL | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 19000295.6 | 18.06.2019 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | PL20180426621 | 09.08.2018 Original published format: PL 42662118 | [2020/07] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608483 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/42, E04B2/46, E04C1/40, E04C2/10 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
E04B2/42 (EP,US);
E04C1/41 (US);
E04B1/66 (US);
E04B1/88 (US);
E04B2/46 (EP,US);
E04C1/40 (EP,US);
E04C2/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2020/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SATZ AUS MODULAREN HOLZHOHLZIEGELN MIT WÄRMEDÄMMEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2020/07] | English: | A SET OF MODULAR TIMBER HOLLOW BRICKS WITH THERMAL INSULATION PROPERTIES | [2020/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE BRIQUES CREUSES EN BOIS MODULAIRE DOTÉ DE PROPRIÉTÉS D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 25.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10110798 (HARTMANN HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0006 0008] * * column 7, lines 20-52; figure -; claims 1,10 *; | [X]DE19841137 (HAGEDORN HARALD [DE]) [X] 1,3 * column 1, lines 3-6 * * column 2, lines 20-23; figure - *; | [X]WO2006084958 (MAKHOVSKYY LEONID VOLODYMYROVY [UA], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]FR978126 (FELIX JEAN REMY TARIS) [X] 1 * pages 1-2; figures 2,8 *; | [A]WO2010047570 (SILINS JANIS [LV], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]PL195459B (MUSZYNSKI ARKADIUSZ [PL]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2149645 (BEDOGNI LUCIANO [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2479877 (GOLAY ROGER SA SCIERIE [CH]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO0222975 (JANDL ADOLF [AT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]PL300445 (BUCKI MARIAN [PL]) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | PL336370 |