EP3711538 - TOOL FOR A SMOKING SUBSTITUTE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 19020169.9 | 22.03.2019 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3711538 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP);
A24F40/00 (EP);
A24F40/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUG FÜR EIN RAUCHERSATZSYSTEM | [2020/39] | English: | TOOL FOR A SMOKING SUBSTITUTE SYSTEM | [2020/39] | French: | OUTIL POUR SYSTÈME DE SUBSTITUTION DU TABAC | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2021/21] | 22.01.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5875534 (JACKSON BENJAMIN C [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-3 * [A] 10-15; | [XA]WO2008034455 (SKF AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 9, line 4 - line 28; figures 1-6 * [A] 10-15; | [XA]US2015013696 (PLOJOUX JULIEN [CH], et al) [X] 15 * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0131]; figures 10-13 *[A] 1-14; | [XAI]US2015257441 (GERKIN LEWIS F [US]) [X] 1-5,8-11,15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-16 * [A] 6,7,12,13 [I] 14; | [XA]CN208096008U (WEITAO ELECTRONIC TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-2 * [A] 1-14; | [XA]WO2019030360 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,2,8,10,11,14,15 * page 16, line 11 - line 33; figures 15-18 * [A] 3-7,9,12,13 |