EP3797903 - ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING PROCESS GAS FOR LIGHTWEIGHT METALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foret, Pierre Bauerstr. 5 80796 München / DE | 02 /
Dietrich, Kai Valpichlerstraße 7 80686 München / DE | 03 /
Pauzon, Camille Storgatan 40B 46130 Trollhättan / SE | 04 /
Arunprasad, Tanja Schwanthalerstrasse 70 80336 München / DE | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Gellner, Bernd Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19020538.5 | 25.09.2019 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797903 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B23K35/38 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/32 (EP,US);
B22F10/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/18 (EP,US);
B22F10/25 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP);
C22C1/056 (EP);
B22F10/322 (EP,US);
B22F12/20 (EP,US);
B22F12/38 (EP,US);
B22F12/67 (EP,US);
B22F12/70 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
B23K35/38 (EP);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, C22C1/056, B22F2201/04, B22F2201/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROZESSGAS ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG VON LEICHTMETALLEN | [2021/13] | English: | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING PROCESS GAS FOR LIGHTWEIGHT METALS | [2021/13] | French: | GAZ DE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE POUR MÉTAUX LÉGERS | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/11] | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016094827 (VELO3D INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0118] , [0135] , [0141] - [0147] * * figures 1-25 *; | [A]WO2016102970 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]EP3219415 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1-7,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0019] - [0026] - [0029] - [0055] - [0058] - [0085] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 8-11,14 |