EP3554143 - INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, USER EQUIPMENT, AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/32] |
Former [2019/42] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Lixia Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department G1-2F, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 02 /
GUAN, Lei Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department G1-2F, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Yongxing Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department G1-2F, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 04 /
SUN, Jingyuan Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department G1-2F, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/42] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19150132.9 | 26.09.2014 | [2019/42] | Priority number, date | WO2014CN71323 | 24.01.2014 Original published format: PCT/CN2014/071323 | [2019/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3554143 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3554143 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W4/02, H04L27/26, H04W4/06 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04L27/2278 (US);
H04L27/26 (EP,US);
H04W4/025 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04L7/007 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/42] | H04W48/16, H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2019/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, BENUTZERGERÄT UND BASISSTATION | [2019/42] | English: | INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, USER EQUIPMENT, AND BASE STATION | [2019/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET STATION DE BASE | [2019/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 16.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14879591.7 / EP3091792 | Divisional application(s) | EP21193730.5 / EP3979713 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2014 | AL | 10.08.2022 | AT | 10.08.2022 | BG | 10.08.2022 | CY | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | MK | 10.08.2022 | NL | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | LU | 26.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | FR | 10.10.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 26.09.2014 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
MK | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 10.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 26.09.2014 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 10.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.09.2014 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 10.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 10.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 10.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 10.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.09.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012008615 (INOUE TAKAMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 4-9 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0079] *; | [A]US2013142138 (DINAN ESMAEL HEJAZI [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 9-15 * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0068] ** paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0114] *; | [A] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Pilot Sequence Allocation Method in E-UTRA Uplink", vol. RAN WG1, no. Cannes, France; 20060627 - 20060630, (20060620), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-061678 UL PILOT SEQUENCE ALLOCATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_0606/Docs/, (20060620), XP050951097 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |