EP3517519 - ETHANE STEAM CRACKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Beatrice 1 & 4 avenue du Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | 02 /
COUPARD, Vincent 1 & 4 avenue du Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | 03 /
RINAUDO, Mathieu 1 & 4 avenue du Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 19150346.5 | 04.01.2019 | [2019/31] | Priority number, date | FR20180050558 | 24.01.2018 Original published format: FR 1850558 | [2019/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3517519 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/76, C07C5/327, C07C11/06, C10G9/36, C10G65/12, C10G69/06 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
C10G9/36 (EP,US);
C07C2/76 (EP,CN,US);
C07C5/327 (EP,US);
C10G11/00 (CN);
C10G65/12 (EP,US);
C10G69/06 (EP,US);
F25J3/0219 (US);
F25J3/0242 (US);
C10G2300/1081 (EP,US);
C10G2300/807 (EP,US);
C10G2400/20 (EP,US);
C10G2400/30 (EP,US);
Y02P30/40 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C2/76, C07C11/06 (US,CN,EP);
C07C2/76, C07C11/08 (CN);
C07C5/327, C07C11/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | C07C2/76, C07C7/04, C07C5/327, C07C11/04, C07C11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] |
Former [2019/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DAMPFKRACKEN VON ETHAN | [2019/31] | English: | ETHANE STEAM CRACKING METHOD | [2019/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE VAPOCRAQUAGE D'ÉTHANE | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 31.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/15] | 22.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005107650 (SUMNER CHARLES [US]) [I] 1-15* claim 1 *; | [I]US2007112236 (BRIDGES ROBERT S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0040]; claim 1 * |