EP3492080 - DOSING REGIMEN FOR SEDATION WITH CNS 7056 (REMIMAZOLAM) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAION UK Ltd. Chivers Way Histon Cambridge CB24 9ZR / GB | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILHELM-OGUNBIYI, Karin Hochscheiter Str. 33 52152 Simmerath / DE | 02 /
BORKETT, Keith Carren House Meadow Lane Houghton CAMPS PE28 2BP / GB | 03 /
TILBROOK, Gary, Stuart 25, Ryston End Downham Market Norfolk PE38 9AX / GB | 04 /
WILTSHIRE, Hugh 6A Harmer Green Lane Digswell Herts AL6 OAD / GB | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/23] | 01 /
WILHELM-OGUNBIYI, Karin Hochscheiter Str. 33 52152 Simmerath / DE | ||
02 /
BORKETT, Keith Carren House Meadow Lane Houghton CAMPS PE28 2BP / GB | |||
03 /
TILBROOK, Gary, Stuart Hunney Cottage Short Lane Bluntisham Huntingdon, Cambridgeshire PE28 3NS / GB | |||
04 /
WILTSHIRE, Hugh 6A Harmer Green Lane Digswell Herts AL6 OAD / GB | Representative(s) | König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Düsseldorf Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | von Renesse, Dorothea, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Mönchenwerther Str. 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19150745.8 | 07.11.2011 | [2019/23] | Priority number, date | EP20100014366 | 08.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10014366 | EP20100014784 | 19.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10014784 | EP20100014819 | 22.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10014819 | EP20100014972 | 25.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10014972 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492080 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4468, A61K31/5517, A61P25/20, A61P25/04, A61K9/00 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/5517 (EP,KR,US);
C07D243/14 (KR);
A61K31/4468 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4468, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/5517, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DOSIERSCHEMA ZUR SEDIERUNG MIT CNS 7056 (REMIMAZOLAM) | [2019/23] | English: | DOSING REGIMEN FOR SEDATION WITH CNS 7056 (REMIMAZOLAM) | [2019/23] | French: | RÉGIME DE DOSAGE PERMETTANT LA SÉDATION AVEC CNS 7056 (REMIMAZOLAM) | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 03.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/51] | 08.09.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/51] | Appeal following examination | 08.02.2022 | Appeal received No. T1161/22 | 08.02.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.04.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.09.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 08.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11794020.5 / EP2637662 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2008007081 (CENES LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1-13 * page 5, lines 15-17 ** page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 11 *; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Dose-finding safety study evaluating CNS 7056 in patients undergoing diagnostic upper GI endoscopy", (20100908), pages 1 - 5, ClinicalTrials.gov, URL: http://www.clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/NCT00869440?term=cns+7056&rank=2, (20111115), XP002663635 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1183243 | WO2008007071 | WO2008007081 |