EP3509316 - SECURITY NETWORK AND SECURITY SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELESTA GmbH Ostfildern (DE) Zweigniederlassung Bad Ragaz Heuteilstrasse 18 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steiner, Roman Berglistrasse 23 8725 Ernetschwil / CH | 02 /
Zöschg, Dietmar R. Im Sunnegarte 5 8824 Schönenberg / CH | 03 /
Geges, Norbert Galtschinisweg 27 7324 Vilters / CH | 04 /
Guntli, Andreas Hanfländerweg 14 8880 Walenstadt / CH | 05 /
Klima, Andreas Unterdorfstrasse 26 8890 Flums / CH | 06 /
Lukas, Verena Stöcklistr. 34B 7205 Zizers / CH | 07 /
Möhr, Raphael Im unteren Stieg 9 7304 Maienfeld / CH | 08 /
Rodoni, Daniele Via Cantonale 53 6948 Porza / CH | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Swisspat Riederer Hasler Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 19150875.3 | 09.01.2019 | [2019/28] | Priority number, date | CH20180000014 | 09.01.2018 Original published format: CH 142018 | [2019/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509316 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00, G05B9/02, G05B19/042, H04L12/40, // H04L12/403 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP);
H04L12/40006 (CH);
F16P3/147 (CH);
G05B9/02 (CH);
H04L12/40169 (EP);
H04Q2209/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSNETZWERK UND SICHERHEITSSENSOR | [2019/28] | English: | SECURITY NETWORK AND SECURITY SENSOR | [2019/28] | French: | RÉSEAU DE SÉCURITÉ ET CAPTEUR DE SÉCURITÉ | [2019/28] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 07.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3715733 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP2099163 (SICK AG [DE]); | [A]DE102012014681 (BALLUFF GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2017119089 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) |