EP3522257 - BATTERY FOR AN INDUSTRIAL TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ribbentrop, Klaus-Peter Theodor-Storm-Straße 15 24558 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | 02 /
Rosenberg, Tilman Jarrestraße 84B 22303 Hamburg / DE | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 19151240.9 | 10.01.2019 | [2019/32] | Priority number, date | DE201810101530 | 24.01.2018 Original published format: DE102018101530 | [2019/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522257 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3522257 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525, B60K1/04, B60L50/60, B60L50/64, B66F9/075, H01M50/204, H01M50/249, H01M50/262 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B66F9/07531 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (US);
B60K1/04 (EP,CN,US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B66F9/0759 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M50/204 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/262 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2001/0405 (CN,US);
B60K2001/0422 (EP,US);
B60L2200/44 (EP,US);
B60P1/00 (US);
B60Y2200/15 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4271 (US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | H01M2/10, H01M10/0525, B60K1/04, B60L50/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BATTERIE FÜR EIN FLURFÖRDERZEUG | [2019/32] | English: | BATTERY FOR AN INDUSTRIAL TRUCK | [2019/32] | French: | BATTERIE POUR UN CHARIOT DE MANUTENTION | [2019/32] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 06.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SE309385 (STILL H AG [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE102005060095 (STILL WAGNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]JP2012201188 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0054] *; | [X]DE102013113809 (STILL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0 10] , [0012] , [0026] - [0032] - [0037] - [0040]; claims 1-10 *; | [X]JP2017076527 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [0036] *; | [X]US2017136864 (ITO HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0058] - [0062] *; | [X]US2017288286 (BUCKHOUT KAMERON FRAIGE SAAD [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract ** paragraphs [0028] , [0039] , [0079] * | Examination | US4026378 | US6189636 | JP2003238083 | US2008011553 | US2009314557 | US2015303423 | US2017259693 |