EP3513756 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATING ULTRASONIC AND ELECTROSURGICAL FUNCTIONALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEISER, Thomas W. 14561 West Bates Place Lakewood, CO Colorado 80228 / US | 02 /
ROSS, Anthony, B. 2162 Placid Drive Boulder, CT Connecticut 80301 / US | 03 /
STODDARD, Robert, B. 618 Meadowbrook Circle Steamboat Springs, CO Colorado 80487 / US | 04 /
SHARP, Robert, M. 4138 Amber Street Boulder, CO Colorado 80304 / US | 05 /
THOMPSON, James, E. 7479 Skyline Way Frederick, CO Colorado 80504 / US | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 19152030.3 | 16.01.2019 | [2019/30] | Priority number, date | US201862618402P | 17.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862618402 P | US201862618292P | 17.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862618292 P | US201862618277P | 17.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862618277 P | US201862618241P | 17.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862618241 P | US201916238600 | 03.01.2019 Original published format: US201916238600 | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3513756 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/320092 (EP,US);
A61B18/1442 (US);
A61B18/1445 (EP);
A61B2017/00411 (US);
A61B2017/320071 (US);
A61B2017/320074 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320094 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320095 (EP);
A61B2017/320098 (US);
A61B2018/00077 (EP);
A61B2018/00083 (EP);
A61B2018/00202 (EP);
A61B2018/00601 (EP);
A61B2018/0063 (EP);
A61B2018/00922 (EP);
A61B2018/00958 (EP);
A61B2018/00994 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1452 (EP,US);
A61B2090/034 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE INSTRUMENTE MIT ULTRASCHALL- UND ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHER FUNKTIONALITÄT | [2019/30] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATING ULTRASONIC AND ELECTROSURGICAL FUNCTIONALITY | [2019/30] | French: | INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX COMPRENANT UNE FONCTIONNALITÉ ULTRASONIQUE ET ÉLECTROCHIRURGICALE | [2019/30] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 22.01.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010145335 (JOHNSON KRISTIN D [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0052] *; | [XY]EP2946737 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,9-14 * paragraphs [0§11] - [0016] - [0 24] , [0 34] - [0035] - [0 44] - [0046] - [0051] , [0060] - [0063] - [0119] - [0136]; figures 1, 4, 6, 24, 25, 33 * [Y] 3,5-8; | [Y]US2016038220 (TWOMEY JOHN R [US]) [Y] 5-8* paragraphs [0052] , [0 67] - [0080] *; | [X]WO2017123837 (ETHICON LLC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0150] - [0151] - [ 464] - [0469]; figures 1, 84A-B, 85A-B * |