EP3514275 - MERGING STRUCTURE FOR SUCTION PIPES, AND YARN WINDING UNIT, SPINNING MACHINE AND TEXTILE MACHINERY INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAZAKI, Yohei c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
IJIMA, Kosuke c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 19152088.1 | 16.01.2019 | [2019/30] | Priority number, date | JP20180007365 | 19.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018007365 | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514275 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D01H11/00, B65H54/88 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
D01H11/005 (EP,CN);
B65H51/22 (EP);
B65H54/702 (EP);
B65H54/88 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] |
Former [2019/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENFÜHRUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR SAUGROHRE SOWIE GARNWICKELEINHEIT, SPINNMASCHINE UND TEXTILMASCHINE DAMIT | [2019/30] | English: | MERGING STRUCTURE FOR SUCTION PIPES, AND YARN WINDING UNIT, SPINNING MACHINE AND TEXTILE MACHINERY INCLUDING THE SAME | [2019/30] | French: | STRUCTURE DE FUSION POUR TUYAUX D'ASPIRATION ET UNITÉ D'ENROULEMENT DE FIL, MACHINE À FILER ET MACHINERIE TEXTILE L'INCLUANT | [2019/30] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 16.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0546644 (SAVIO SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 38 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 40; figure 1 * [I] 7-10; | [X]US5453117 (CARTER JERRY T [US], et al) [X] 1,4,12 * column 1, line 9 - column 1, line 15 * * column 5, line 13 - column 5, line 18 * * column 7, line 7 - column 7, line 16; figures 1, 9 *; | [I]EP2573018 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [I] 13-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054]; figures 10, 12 *; | [A]JP2014009052 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1,13,15,16* paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047]; figure 3 *; | [X]EP2799380 (SAVIO MACCHINE TESSILI SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3,11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045]; figures 2, 5 *; | [X]EP3020854 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [X] 1,16 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039]; figures 3-5 * | by applicant | JP2013067873 |