EP3684154 - THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE INSERT ELEMENT FOR ELECTRONIC UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited The Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [2023/13] |
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORTA, Jakub ul. Reduta 46/37 31241 KRAKOW / PL | 02 /
FRUEND, Marcel Ehringhausen 93 42859 REMSCHEID / DE | 03 /
KAUFMANN, Klaus HUETTER BUSCHSTRASSE 16 42349 WUPPERTAL / DE | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 19152913.0 | 21.01.2019 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3684154 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3684154 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
H05K7/20854 (EP,CN);
H05K7/20418 (US);
H01L23/3675 (US);
H01L23/433 (US);
H01L23/473 (US);
H05K5/069 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄRMELEITFÄHIGES EINSATZELEMENT FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE EINHEIT | [2020/30] | English: | THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE INSERT ELEMENT FOR ELECTRONIC UNIT | [2020/30] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'INSERT THERMOCONDUCTEUR POUR UNITÉ ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 14.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]EP2916636 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,12 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 3 * [A] 6 [Y] 7 [I] 8-11,13-15; | [Y]DE102016106180 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [Y] 7* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033]; figures 4-5 * | Examination | US2013329367 |