EP3530734 - A NOVEL CLASS OF THERAPEUTIC PROTEIN BASED MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansun Biopharma, Inc. 3030 Callan Road San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Fang 11124 Corte Plano Verano San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
MALAKHOV, Michael 1578 Indiana St., Apt. 8 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Newton, Michael Jonathan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 19153015.3 | 21.07.2005 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | US200493926204 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: US 93926204 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530734 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/24, C12N1/20, C12N15/00, C07H21/04, A61K38/47, A61K38/00, A61K39/00 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
C12N9/2402 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/75 (KR);
A61P11/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H21/04 (KR);
C12Y302/01018 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/01 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2760/16111 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/35] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE KLASSE VON THERAPEUTISCHEN PROTEINBASIERTEN MOLEKÜLEN | [2019/35] | English: | A NOVEL CLASS OF THERAPEUTIC PROTEIN BASED MOLECULES | [2019/35] | French: | NOUVELLE CLASSE DE MOLÉCULES À BASE DE PROTÉINES THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05790917.8 / EP1786902 | EP15180371.5 / EP3018204 | EP17164276.2 / EP3241898 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004047735 (YU MANG [US], et al); | [XP]US2005112751 (FANG FANG [US], et al); | by applicant | US3439089 | US20020428535 | US20030464217 | US20030718986 | US20040561749 | US20040580084 |