EP3517799 - FLEXING SPRING ELEMENT MADE FROM A FIBRE PLASTIC COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANTO Invention GmbH & Co. KG Sangenweg 20 64589 Stockstadt am Rhein / DE | For all designated states Rheinmetall Invent GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Str. 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2024/27] |
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states DANTO Invention GmbH & Co. KG Sangenweg 20 64589 Stockstadt am Rhein / DE | ||
For all designated states KS Kolbenschmidt GmbH Karl-Schmidt-Strasse 2 74172 Neckarsulm / DE | |||
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states DANTO Invention GmbH & Co. KG Sangenweg 20 64589 Stockstadt am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Tobias Am Geispitzheimer Hof 6 67596 Dittelsheim-Heßloch / DE | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Habermann Intellectual Property Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Dolivostraße 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 19153741.4 | 25.01.2019 | [2019/31] | Priority number, date | DE201810101736 | 25.01.2018 Original published format: DE102018101736 | [2019/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3517799 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/368, F16F1/42, F16F1/02, // F16F1/13 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
F16F1/368 (EP);
F16F1/024 (EP);
F16F1/422 (EP);
F16F1/13 (EP);
F16F2228/06 (EP);
F16F2230/0023 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | F16F1/368, F16F1/42, // F16F1/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] |
Former [2019/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIEGEFEDERELEMENT AUS FASERKUNSTSTOFFVERBUNDMATERIAL | [2019/31] | English: | FLEXING SPRING ELEMENT MADE FROM A FIBRE PLASTIC COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2019/31] | French: | ÉLÉMENT À RESSORT DE FLEXION CONSTITUÉ D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE À BASE DE FIBRES SYNTHÉTIQUES | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 31.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]WO8500207 (SECRETARY TRADE IND BRIT [GB]) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-34 * * page 4, line 32 - line 37 * * page 7, line 14 - line 20 * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 25 * [A] 3-6,10 [Y] 11-13 [I] 8,9; | [XA]US5102107 (SIMON JEAN-MICHEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * column 10, line 3 - line 28 * [A] 9-12; | [XA]JPH084816 (KURASHIKI KAKO) [X] 1,2,7,9,11 * figures 1, 5, 13 * [A] 8,10,12,13; | [XI]EP1046361 (RECTICEL [BE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 1, 2 * * Absätze [0010], [0027] * [I] 4; | [YA]DE102013223038 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 11-13 * figures 4a, 4b * * Absätze [0017]-[0020], [0030], [0040] * [A] 1-10; | [A]EP2990684 (KELLER TOBIAS [DE]) [A] 1-13* abstract * |