EP3569292 - HORIZONTAL BAR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Dosoly Mechanical and Electrical Technology Co., Ltd. Hengxi Village Datian Street Linhai City Taizhou City, Zhejiang 317004 / CN | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAN, Caihua Hengxi Village, Datian Street, Linhai City Taizhou City, Zhejiang 317004 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Zheng Hengxi Village, Datian Street, Linhai City Taizhou City, Zhejiang 317004 / CN | 03 /
XU, Gaoyang Hengxi Village, Datian Street, Linhai City Taizhou City, Zhejiang 317004 / CN | 04 /
YIN, Ruzhong Hengxi Village, Datian Street, Linhai City Taizhou City, Zhejiang 317004 / CN | 05 /
LIANG, Rixin Hengxi Village, Datian Street, Linhai City Taizhou City, Zhejiang 317004 / CN | 06 /
FAN, Ying Hengxi Village, Datian Street, Linhai City Taizhou City, Zhejiang 317004 / CN | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 19153815.6 | 25.01.2019 | [2019/47] | Priority number, date | CN201810461905 | 15.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810461905 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569292 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63B1/00, A63B17/04, A63B21/068, A63B23/12 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
A63B17/04 (EP,CN);
A63B1/00 (EP,CN,US);
A63B21/068 (EP);
A63B23/12 (EP);
A63B23/1218 (EP);
A63B2210/50 (EP,CN,US);
A63B2225/093 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HORIZONTALE STANGENVORRICHTUNG | [2019/47] | English: | HORIZONTAL BAR DEVICE | [2019/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BARRE HORIZONTALE | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/45] | 21.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1582487 (SHANK JOSEPH H) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]US6551224 (LIM EDGAR [US]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]FR2871390 (CESSY FREDERIC [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO2018011650 (LE NGUYEN KHANH TRINH [VN]) [A] 1 * figure - * |