EP3524676 - OPSIN POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of The Leland Stanford Junior University Office of The General Counsel Building 170, 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEISSEROTH, Karl 720 Alvarado Row Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Feng P.O. Box 91 Sidney Street, No. 801 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19153835.4 | 12.12.2012 | [2019/33] | Priority number, date | US201161576858P | 16.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161576858 P | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3524676 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C07K1/00, C07K14/00 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C07K14/405 (CN);
C07K14/47 (US);
A61N5/06 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/195 (CN);
C12N13/00 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (US);
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
C07K2319/03 (CN,US);
C07K2319/04 (CN,US);
C07K2319/60 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPSIN-POLYPEPTIDE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2019/33] | English: | OPSIN POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2019/33] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES OPSINES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2019/33] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 07.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12858055.2 / EP2791333 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011165681 (BOYDEN EDWARD S [US], et al) [X] 1,3-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0110] * [Y] 2; | [Y]WO2011116238 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2012027358 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0199] - paragraph [0200]; claims 1-22; tables 3,5; sequences 86,17,18,20 *; | [Y] - SHARMA ADRIAN K ET AL, "Evolution of rhodopsin ion pumps in haloarchaea", BMC EVOLUTIONARY BIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20070518), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2148-7-79, ISSN 1471-2148, page 79, XP021027855 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2148-7-79 | [Y] - "SubName: Full=Bacteriorhodopsin {ECO:0000313|EMBL:ABT17417.1};", UniProt, (20100810), Database accession no. A7U0Y6, URL: EBI, XP002739968 [Y] 1-15 * sequence . * | [Y] - XUE HAN ET AL, "A High-Light Sensitivity Optical Neural Silencer: Development and Application to Optogenetic Control of Non-Human Primate Cortex", FRONTIERS IN SYSTEMS NEUROSCIENCE, (20110413), vol. 5, doi:10.3389/fnsys.2011.00018, XP055265835 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnsys.2011.00018 | [Y] - ZHANG F ET AL, "Optogenetic interrogation of neural circuits: Technology for probing mammalian brain structures", NATURE PROTOCOLS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1038/NPROT.2009.226, ISSN 1750-2799, (20100301), pages 439 - 456, (20100218), XP009172355 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 439, column r, paragraph 2 - page 440, column l, paragraph 1; figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2009.226 | by applicant | US4797368 | WO9118088 | EP0488528 | US5139941 | WO9303769 | WO9309239 | WO9319191 | WO9412649 | WO9428938 | WO9500655 | US5387742 | WO9511984 | WO9617951 | US5874304 | WO9911764 | US5919445 | US5958713 | US5968750 | US5968738 | US5976796 | US5985577 | US6020192 | US6066476 | US6447784 | US6566118 | US6596535 | US6649811 | US2004131637 | US6989264 | US6995006 | US7632679 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19690000), vol. 243, pages 3552 - 59 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - PULKKINEN; MILLER, J. Bacteriol., (19910000), vol. 173, no. 1, pages 86 - 93 | - ALPUCHE-ARANDA et al., PNAS, (19920000), vol. 89, no. 21, pages 10079 - 83 | - HARBORNE et al., Mol. Micro., (19920000), vol. 6, pages 2805 - 2813 | - DUNSTAN et al., Infect. Immun., (19990000), vol. 67, pages 5133 - 5141 | - MCKELVIE et al., Vaccine, (20040000), vol. 22, pages 3243 - 3255 | - CHATFIELD et al., Biotechnol, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 888 - 892 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AX798980 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AX798961 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AX798183 | - SHETRON-RAMA et al., Infect. Immun., (20020000), vol. 70, pages 1087 - 1096 | - VALDIVIA; FALKOW, Mol. Microbiol., (19960000), vol. 22, page 367 | - HILLEN,W.; WISSMANN,A., Topics in Molecular and Structural Biology, Protein-Nucleic Acid Interaction, Macmillan, (19890000), vol. 10, pages 143 - 162 | - MELTON et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19840000), vol. 12, page 7035 | - DEBOER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19830000), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - LI et al., Invest Opthalmol Vis Sci, (19940000), vol. 35, page 2543 2549 | - BORRAS et al., Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 6, page 515 524 | - LI; DAVIDSON, PNAS, (19950000), vol. 92, page 7700 7704 | - SAKAMOTO et al., H Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 5, page 1088 1097 | - ALI et al., Hum Gene Ther, (19980000), vol. 9, page 81 86 | - FLANNERY et al., PNAS, (19970000), vol. 94, page 6916 6921 | - BENNETT et al., Invest Opthalmol Vis Sci, (19970000), vol. 38, page 2857 2863 | - JOMARY et al., Gene Ther, (19970000), vol. 4, page 683 690 | - ROLLING et al., Hum Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 10, page 641 648 | - ALI et al., Hum Mol Genet, (19960000), vol. 5, page 591 594 | - SAMULSKI et al., J. Vir., (19890000), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3828 | - MENDELSON et al., Virol, (19880000), vol. 166, pages 154 - 165 | - FLOTTE et al., PNAS, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 10613 - 10617 | - MIYOSHI et al., PNAS, (19970000), vol. 94, page 10319 23 | - TAKAHASHI et al., J Virol, (19990000), vol. 73, page 7812 7816 | - BLACKLOW, Parvoviruses and Human Disease, (19880000), pages 165 - 174 | - ROSE, Comprehensive Virology, (19740000), vol. 3, page 1 | - "The Evolution of Parvovirus Taxonomy", P. TATTERSALL, Parvoviruses, Hudder Arnold, (20060000), pages 5 - 14 | - DE BOWLES; JE RABINOWITZ; RJ SAMULSKI, The Genus Dependovirus, Hudder Arnold, (20060000), pages 15 - 23 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. L04147 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. M55301 | - CHEN et al., Cell, (19870000), vol. 51, pages 7 - 19 | - LLEWELLYN et al., Nat. Med., (20100000), vol. 16, page 1161 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. S62283 | - Nucl. Acids. Res., (19870000), vol. 15, pages 2363 - 2384 | - Neuron, (19910000), vol. 6, pages 583 - 594 | - RADOVICK et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 3402 - 3406 | - OBERDICK et al., Science, (19900000), vol. 248, pages 223 - 226 | - BARTGE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 3648 - 3652 | - COMB et al., EMBO J., (19880000), vol. 17, pages 3793 - 3805 | - LIU et al., Gene Therapy, (20040000), vol. 11, pages 52 - 60 | - LEE et al., Development, (20040000), vol. 131, pages 3295 - 3306 | - MAYFORD et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, page 13250 | - CARRIER et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, pages 1176 - 1181 | - SIZEMORE et al., Science, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 299 - 302 | - MATZ et al., Nature Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 17, pages 969 - 973 | - GRADINARU et al., J. Neurosci., (20070000), vol. 27, no. 52, pages 14231 - 14238 | - ZHANG et al., Nature, (20070000), vol. 446, pages 633 - 639 | - ZHANG et al., Nature Reviews Neuroscience, (20070000), vol. 8, pages 577 - 581 | - MAYBERG HS et al., "Deep Brain Stimulation for Treatment-Resistant Depression", Neuron, (20050303), vol. 45, pages 651 - 660 | - SCHLAEPFER et al., "Deep Brain stimulation to Reward Circuitry Alleviates Anhedonia in Refractory Major Depression", Neuropsychopharmacology, (20070000), pages 1 - 10 | - DEISSEROTH, K., "Optogenetics", Nat Methods, (20110000), vol. 8, pages 26 - 29 | - DEISSEROTH, K., "Controlling the brain with light", Sci Am, (20100000), vol. 303, pages 48 - 55 | - FENNO, L.; YIZHAR, O.; DEISSEROTH, K., "The development and application of optogenetics", Annu Rev Neurosci, (20110000), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev-neuro-061010-113817, pages 389 - 412, XP055135085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-neuro-061010-113817 | - YIZHAR, O.; FENNO, L.E.; DAVIDSON, T.J.; MOGRI, M.; DEISSEROTH, K., "Optogenetics in neural systems", Neuron, (20110000), vol. 71, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neuron.2011.06.004, pages 9 - 34, XP028379910 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuron.2011.06.004 | - WANG, C.; KANE, M.A.; NAPOLI, J.L., "Multiple retinol and retinal dehydrogenases catalyze all-trans-retinoic acid biosynthesis in astrocytes", J Biol Chem, (20110000), vol. 286, pages 6542 - 6553 | - BOYDEN, E.S.; ZHANG, F.; BAMBERG, E.; NAGEL, G.; DEISSEROTH, K., "Millisecond-timescale, genetically targeted optical control of neural activity", Nat Neurosci, (20050000), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nn1525, pages 1263 - 1268, XP055012811 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn1525 | - LI, X. et al., "Fast noninvasive activation and inhibition of neural and network activity by vertebrate rhodopsin and green algae channelrhodopsin", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (20050000), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0509030102, pages 17816 - 17821, XP009159155 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0509030102 | - BI, A. et al., "Ectopic expression of a microbial-type rhodopsin restores visual responses in mice with photoreceptor degeneration", Neuron, (20060000), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neuron.2006.02.026, pages 23 - 33, XP002406402 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuron.2006.02.026 | - ISHIZUKA, T.; KAKUDA, M.; ARAKI, R.; YAWO, H., "Kinetic evaluation of photosensitivity in genetically engineered neurons expressing green algae light-gated channels", Neurosci Res, (20060000), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neures.2005.10.009, pages 85 - 94, XP024955895 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neures.2005.10.009 | - NAGEL, G. et al., "Light activation of channelrhodopsin-2 in excitable cells of Caenorhabditis elegans triggers rapid behavioral responses", Curr Biol, (20050000), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cub.2005.11.032, pages 2279 - 2284, XP027513347 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cub.2005.11.032 | - GRADINARU, V. et al., "Targeting and readout strategies for fast optical neural control in vitro and in vivo", J Neurosci, (20070000), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.3578-07.2007, pages 14231 - 14238, XP055401440 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.3578-07.2007 | - GUNAYDIN, L.A. et al., "Ultrafast optogenetic control", Nat Neurosci, (20100000), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1038/nn.2495, pages 387 - 392, XP055135011 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn.2495 | - BERNDT, A.; YIZHAR, O.; GUNAYDIN, L.A.; HEGEMANN, P.; DEISSEROTH, K., "Bistable neural state switches", Nat Neurosci, (20090000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1038/nn.2247, pages 229 - 234, XP055106451 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn.2247 | - KLEINLOGEL, S. et al., "Ultra light-sensitive and fast neuronal activation with the Ca(2+)-permeable channelrhodopsin CatCh", Nat Neurosci, (20110000), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1038/nn.2776, pages 513 - 518, XP055009508 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn.2776 | - ZHANG, F. et al., "Red-shifted optogenetic excitation: a tool for fast neural control derived from Volvox carteri", Nat Neurosci, (20080000), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nn.2120, pages 631 - 633, XP002487916 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn.2120 | - GOVORUNOVA, E.G.; SPUDICH, E.N.; LANE, C.E.; SINESHCHEKOV, O.A.; SPUDICH, J.L., "New channelrhodopsin with a red-shifted spectrum and rapid kinetics from Mesostigma viride", MBio, (20110000), vol. 2, pages eOO 115 - 00111 | - LIN, J.Y.; LIN, M.Z.; STEINBACH, P.; TSIEN, R.Y., "Characterization of engineered channelrhodopsin variants with improved properties and kinetics", Biophys J, (20090000), vol. 96, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bpj.2008.11.034, pages 1803 - 1814, XP008151895 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bpj.2008.11.034 | - WANG, H. et al., "Molecular determinants differentiating photocurrent properties of two channelrhodopsins from chlamydomonas", J Biol Chem, (20090000), vol. 284, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M807632200, pages 5685 - 5696, XP008151880 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M807632200 | - WEN, L. et al., "Opto-current-clamp actuation of cortical neurons using a strategically designed channelrhodopsin", PLoS One, (20100000), vol. 5, page e12893 | - STEHFEST, K.; HEGEMANN, P., "Evolution of the channelrhodopsin photocycle model", Chemphyschem, vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1002/cphc.200900980, pages 1120 - 1126, XP055136138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cphc.200900980 | - BAMANN, C.; KIRSCH, T.; NAGEL, G.; BAMBERG, E., "Spectral characteristics of the photocycle of channelrhodopsin-2 and its implication for channel function", J Mol Biol, (20080000), vol. 375, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2007.10.072, pages 686 - 694, XP022400110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2007.10.072 | - SUGIYAMA, Y. et al., "Photocurrent attenuation by a single polar-to-nonpolar point mutation of channelrhodopsin-2", Photochem Photobiol Sci, (20090000), vol. 8, pages 328 - 336 | - HEDRICK, T.; WATERS, T.H., "Spiking patterns of neocortical L5 pyramidal neurons in vitro change with temperature", Front Cell Neurosci, (20110000), vol. 5, page 1 | - CARDIN, J.A. et al., "Driving fast-spiking cells induces gamma rhythm and controls sensory responses", Nature, (20090000), vol. 459, pages 663 - 667 | - SOHAL, V.S.; ZHANG, F.; YIZHAR, O.; DEISSEROTH, K., "Parvalbumin neurons and gamma rhythms enhance cortical circuit performance", Nature, (20090000), vol. 459, doi:doi:10.1038/nature07991, pages 698 - 702, XP055135667 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature07991 | - TSAI, H.C. et al., "Phasic firing in dopaminergic neurons is sufficient for behavioral conditioning", Science, (20090000), vol. 324, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1168878, pages 1080 - 1084, XP055107925 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1168878 | - ATASOY, D.; APONTE, Y.; SU, H.H.; STERNSON, S.M., "A FLEX switch targets Channelrhodopsin-2 to multiple cell types for imaging and long-range circuit mapping", J Neurosci, (20080000), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.1954-08.2008, pages 7025 - 7030, XP055482038 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.1954-08.2008 | - CHATER, T.E.; HENLEY, J.M.; BROWN, J.T.; RANDALL, A.D., "Voltage- and temperature-dependent gating of heterologously expressed channelrhodopsin-2", J Neurosci Methods, (20100000), vol. 193, pages 7 - 13 | - ZHANG, F. et al., "Multimodal fast optical interrogation of neural circuitry", Nature, (20070000), vol. 446, doi:doi:10.1038/nature05744, pages 633 - 639, XP002487911 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature05744 | - GRADINARU, V. et al., "Molecular and cellular approaches for diversifying and extending optogenetics", Cell, (20100000), vol. 141, doi:doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2010.02.037, pages 154 - 165, XP002704864 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.CELL.2010.02.037 | - HAN, X.; BOYDEN, E.S., "Multiple-color optical activation, silencing, and desynchronization of neural activity, with single-spike temporal resolution", PLoS One, (20070000), vol. 2, page e299 | - WITTEN, I.B. et al., "Cholinergic interneurons control local circuit activity and cocaine conditioning", Science, (20100000), vol. 330, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1193771, pages 1677 - 1681, XP055135834 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1193771 | - STUBER, G.D. et al., "Excitatory transmission from the amygdala to nucleus accumbens facilitates reward seeking", Nature, (20110000), vol. 475, pages 377 - 380 | - TYE, K.M. et al., "Amygdala circuitry mediating reversible and bidirectional control of anxiety", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, doi:doi:10.1038/nature09820, pages 358 - 362, XP055287700 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09820 | - GRADINARU, V.; THOMPSON, K.R.; DEISSEROTH, K., "eNpHR: a Natronomonas halorhodopsin enhanced for optogenetic applications", Brain Cell Biol, (20080000), vol. 36, doi:doi:10.1007/s11068-008-9027-6, pages 129 - 139, XP002557433 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11068-008-9027-6 | - CHOW, B.Y. et al., "High-performance genetically targetable optical neural silencing by light-driven proton pumps", Nature, (20100000), vol. 463, doi:doi:10.1038/nature08652, pages 98 - 102, XP055248714 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08652 | - HAN, X. et al., "A high-light sensitivity optical neural silencer: development and application to optogenetic control of non-human primate cortex", Front. Syst. Neurosci., (20110000), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.3389/fnsys.2011.00018, XP055265835 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnsys.2011.00018 | - ZIMMERMANN, D. et al., "Effects on capacitance by overexpression of membrane proteins", Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20080000), vol. 369, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2008.02.153, pages 1022 - 1026, XP022575456 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2008.02.153 | - ZHAO, Y. et al., "An expanded palette of genetically encoded Ca(2) indicators", Science, (20110000), vol. 333, pages 1888 - 1891 | - GOTO, Y.; O'DONNELL, P., "Network synchrony in the nucleus accumbens in vivo", J Neurosci, (20010000), vol. 21, pages 4498 - 4504 | - SANCHEZ-VIVES, M.V.; MCCORMICK, D.A., "Cellular and network mechanisms of rhythmic recurrent activity in neocortex", Nat Neurosci, (20000000), vol. 3, pages 1027 - 1034 | - NAGEL, G. et al., "Channelrhodopsin-2, a directly light-gated cation-selective membrane channel", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20030000), vol. 100, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1936192100, pages 13940 - 13945, XP002406405 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1936192100 | - GOOLD, C.P.; NICOLL, R.A., "Single-cell optogenetic excitation drives homeostatic synaptic depression", Neuron, (20100000), vol. 68, pages 512 - 528 | - LINDSAY, T.H.; THIELE, T.R.; LOCKERY, S.R., "Optogenetic analysis of synaptic transmission in the central nervous system of the nematode Caenorhabditis elegans", Nat Commun, (20110000), vol. 2, page 306 | - TAYLOR, C.P.; DUDEK, F.E., "Synchronous neural afterdischarges in rat hippocampal slices without active chemical synapses", Science, (19820000), vol. 218, pages 810 - 812 | - REN, J. et al., "Habenula ''cholinergic'' neurons co-release glutamate and acetylcholine and activate postsynaptic neurons via distinct transmission modes", Neuron, (20110000), vol. 69, pages 445 - 452 | WO2005US27091 |