EP3560640 - CLAMPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/44] | RELEASE DEVICE FOR A CLAMPING DEVICE | ||
[2024/16] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ott-Jakob Spanntechnik GmbH Industriestrasse 3-7 87663 Lengenwang / DE | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greif, Josef Haslacher Weg 10 87496 Friesenried / DE | 02 /
Merz, Florian Am Lindenberg 2 a 87668 Rieden / DE | 03 /
Neugebauer, Gerd Kemptener Str. 26 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | 04 /
Bechteler, Wolfgang Bahnleite 2 87640 Ebenhofen / DE | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [2024/23] |
Former [2019/44] | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19153983.2 | 28.01.2019 | [2019/44] | Priority number, date | DE201810110064 | 26.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018110064 | [2019/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560640 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560640 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/26, B23Q17/00, F15B15/14 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
B23B31/265 (EP);
B23Q17/005 (EP);
B23B2231/26 (EP);
B23B2231/50 (EP);
B23B2260/128 (EP);
F15B15/1423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPANNVORRICHTUNG | [2024/16] | English: | CLAMPING DEVICE | [2024/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE | [2024/16] |
Former [2019/44] | LÖSEEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SPANNVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2019/44] | RELEASE DEVICE FOR A CLAMPING DEVICE | ||
Former [2019/44] | AGENCEMENT DE LIBÉRATION POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE | Examination procedure | 11.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 30.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000246592 (NIPPEI TOYAMA CORP); | [A]DE102006060527 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [XY]US2013276516 (TABOR KENT [US]); | [XY]JP2014108461 (KITAGAWA IRON WORKS CO); | [A]DE102015116347 (JTEKT CORP [JP]); | [YD]DE102016108407 (OTT-JAKOB SPANNTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) | Examination | DE10307565 |