EP3508196 - ARIPIPRAZOLE PRODRUG COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited Connaught House 1 Burlington Road Dublin 4, D04 C5Y6 / IE | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRESSWELL, Philip 15 Pearse Court Pearse Street Athlone / IE | 02 /
HICKEY, Magali 440 Pond Street Westwood, MA 02090 / US | 03 /
LIVERSIDGE, Elaine 250 Frist Avenue Unit 526 Charlestown, MA 02129 / US | 04 /
MANSER, David 2 Mosstown Court Keenagh County Longford / IE | 05 /
PALMIERI, Michael Jr. 179 South Street Upton, MA 01568 / US | 06 /
PAQUETTE, Sara Montminy 11 Brigham Street Unit 15B Hudson, MA 01749 / US | 07 /
PERKIN, Kristopher 23 Waterville Bealnamulla Athlone Co. Roscommon / IE | 08 /
SMITH, Greg 134 John Scott Boulevard Norton, MA 02766 / US | 09 /
STEINBERG, Brian 134 George Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 10 /
TURNCLIFF, Ryan 21 Rossi Lane Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 11 /
ZEIDAN, Tarek 499 Lowell Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 12 /
CASH, Ethan P. 14 Ward Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 13 /
HARD, Marjie L. 10 Winter Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2021/28] |
Former [2019/28] | 01 /
CRESSWELL, Philip 15 Pearse Court Pearse Street Athlone / IE | ||
02 /
HICKEY, Magali 440 Pond Street Westwood, MA Massachusetts 02090 / US | |||
03 /
LIVERSIDGE, Elaine 250 Frist Avenue Unit 526 Charlestown, MA 02129 / US | |||
04 /
MANSER, David 2 Mosstown Court Keenagh County Longford / IE | |||
05 /
PALMIERI, Michael Jr. 179 South Street Upton, MA 01568 / US | |||
06 /
PAQUETTE, Sara Montminy 11 Brigham Street Unit 15B Hudson, MA 01749 / US | |||
07 /
PERKIN, Kristopher 23 Waterville Bealnamulla Athlone Co. Roscommon / IE | |||
08 /
SMITH, Greg 134 John Scott Boulevard Norton, MA 02766 / US | |||
09 /
STEINBERG, Brian 134 George Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | |||
10 /
TURNCLIFF, Ryan 21 Rossi Lane Ashland, MA 01721 / US | |||
11 /
ZEIDAN, Tarek 499 Lowell Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
12 /
CASH, Ethan P. 14 Ward Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | |||
13 /
HARD, Marjie L. 10 Winter Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 19154013.7 | 17.08.2015 | [2019/28] | Priority number, date | EP20140181328 | 18.08.2014 Original published format: EP 14181328 | US201462038665P | 18.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462038665 P | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508196 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3508196 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/14, A61K31/496 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K45/06 (IL,US);
A61K47/26 (IL,US);
A61K9/145 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/18 (EP,IL);
A61P25/22 (EP,IL);
A61P25/24 (EP,IL)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2019/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ARIPIPRAZOL-PRODRUGZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/28] | English: | ARIPIPRAZOLE PRODRUG COMPOSITIONS | [2019/28] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PROMÉDICAMENT D'ARIPIPRAZOLE | [2019/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 09.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15750750.0 / EP3182958 | Divisional application(s) | EP21184804.9 Application refused : 18.11.2021 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 04.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 04.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO03030872 (COOPER EUGENE R [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 29, lines 29-31; claims 1-38 * * page 31, lines 4-12 * [A] 16; | [IDA]WO2005041937 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [ID] 1-15 * figure 3; example 4 *[A] 16; | [IA]US2012238552 (PERRY JASON M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0117] , [0190]; example 2; table 4 * [A] 16 | by applicant | US5470583 | US5510118 | US5518187 | US5534270 | US5543133 | US5560932 | WO9714407 | US5662883 | US5665331 | US5718388 | US5862999 | US6406718 | US8431576 | - RAM B. GUPTA; UDAY B. KOMPELLA, Nanoparticle technology for drug delivery, Taylor & Franceis Group, pages 121 - 131 | - Pharmaceutics, the science of dosage form design, Churchill Livingstone, pages 569 - 580 | - LEI SHEN; ATHENA GUO; XIAOYANG ZHU, "Tween surfactants: Adsorption, self-organization, and protein resistance", Surface Science, (20110000), vol. 605, doi:doi:10.1016/j.susc.2010.12.005, pages 494 - 499, XP055370923 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.susc.2010.12.005 |