EP3521724 - CONTROLLER AND ROOM CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niko NV Industriepark-West 40 9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE BRABANDER, Gino Molenstraat 37 9112 Sinaai / BE | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Winger Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | DenK iP Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 19154361.0 | 29.01.2019 | [2019/32] | Priority number, date | BE20180005061 | 01.02.2018 Original published format: BE 201805061 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3521724 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/80, F24F110/10, F24F110/20, F24F110/70, F24F110/66, G05D23/19 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
G05D23/1919 (EP);
F24F11/80 (EP);
G05D23/19 (EP);
F24F2110/10 (EP);
F24F2110/20 (EP);
F24F2110/66 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] |
Former [2019/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGLER UND RAUMKONDITIONIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/32] | English: | CONTROLLER AND ROOM CONDITIONING SYSTEM | [2019/32] | French: | ORGANE DE COMMANDE ET SYSTÈME DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE PIÈCES | [2019/32] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 27.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1856454 (AIRCUITY INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] ** figure - *; | [X]US2009283603 (PETERSON JEREMY W [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0023] * * figure - *; | [X]US2015323941 (PARISEAU DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2016209063 (FANG YI-TSE [TW]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * figure - * |