EP3533930 - METHOD FOR GENERATING A CONTROLLED UNDERPRESSURE IN AT LEAST ONE DRYER DRUM OF A SYSTEM FOR ASPHALT MANUFACTURING AND SAID SYSTEM FOR ASPHALT MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benninghoven Zweigniederlassung der Wirtgen Mineral Technologies GmbH Benninghovenstrasse 1 54516 Wittlich / DE | [2021/47] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Benninghoven GmbH & Co. KG Benninghovenstraße 1 54516 Wittlich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renk, Christian Zum Wiesental 19 54538 Bengel / DE | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 19154964.1 | 01.02.2019 | [2019/36] | Priority number, date | DE201810203196 | 02.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018203196 | EP20180202312 | 24.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18202312 | [2019/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3533930 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/05, E01C19/10, F26B11/04, F26B21/10, F26B23/02, F26B25/00 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
E01C19/05 (EP);
E01C19/1004 (EP);
E01C19/1009 (EP);
E01C19/1063 (EP);
F16B21/10 (EP);
F26B11/04 (EP);
F26B21/10 (EP);
F26B23/02 (EP);
F26B25/007 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/36] | E01C19/05, E01C19/10, F26B11/04, F16B21/10, F26B23/02, F26B25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN EINES GEREGELTEN UNTERDRUCKS IN MINDESTENS EINER TROCKENTROMMEL EINER ANLAGE ZUR ASPHALTHERSTELLUNG SOWIE DERARTIGE ANLAGE ZUR ASPHALTHERSTELLUNG | [2019/36] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING A CONTROLLED UNDERPRESSURE IN AT LEAST ONE DRYER DRUM OF A SYSTEM FOR ASPHALT MANUFACTURING AND SAID SYSTEM FOR ASPHALT MANUFACTURING | [2019/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'UNE DÉPRESSION RÉGLÉE DANS AU MOINS UN TAMBOUR DE SÉCHAGE D'UNE INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION D'ASPHALTE AINSI QU'UNE TELLE INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION D'ASPHALTE | [2019/36] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 06.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/38] | 16.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE9318822U (AMMANN MASCHINENFABRIK AG LANG [CH]) [X] 1,3,5-9,12-14 * figure 1 * * the whole document * [I] 2,10,11; | [XI]JP2000248507 (NIKKO KK) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,12-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0021] * * the whole document *[I] 2,10,11; | [XI]DE102004014782 (AMMANN ASPHALT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,12,14,15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * the whole document * [I] 2,10,11 |