EP3498337 - COMPOSITION FOR THE RELIEF, IMPROVEMENT, PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT OF DRY EYE SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agencia Pública Empresarial Sanitaria Hospital Alto Guadalquivir Avda. Blas Infante s/n 23740 Andújar (Jaén) / ES | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villegas Becerril, Enrique Avda. Blas Infante, s/n Andújar 23740 Jaén / ES | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Hoffmann Eitle S.L.U. Paseo de la Castellana 140, 3a planta Edificio LIMA 28046 Madrid / ES | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 19155489.8 | 23.09.2015 | [2019/25] | Priority number, date | ES20140031379 | 23.09.2014 Original published format: ES 201431379 | ES20140031854 | 16.12.2014 Original published format: ES 201431854 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3498337 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61P27/04, A61K36/886, A61K9/00, A61K9/127, A61K31/65, A61K36/28, A61K36/53 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
A61K36/53 (EP,US);
A61K31/65 (EP,US);
A61K36/28 (EP,US);
A61K36/886 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61P27/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/53, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/886, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/05] |
Former [2019/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR LINDERUNG, BESSERUNG, PRÄVENTION UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG VON TROCKENEM AUGE | [2019/25] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR THE RELIEF, IMPROVEMENT, PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT OF DRY EYE SYNDROME | [2019/25] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SOULAGEMENT, D'AMÉLIORATION, DE PRÉVENTION ET/OU DE TRAITEMENT DU SYNDROME DE L' IL SEC | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/05] | 19.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/14] | 02.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15845327.4 / EP3199163 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6013259 (DE DE LA PENA NURIA E A C [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-4 *; | [XY]WO2013140009 (GARCIA GILABERT JUAN MIGUEL [ES]) [X] 1-5,8-11,13 * claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y] - INOOKA M, "Aqueous external composition for use as eye drops or nasal drops, comprises alginic acid, nonionic surfactant, boric acid and phosphoric acid, tocopherol and azulene or its derivatives", WPI/THOMSON,, (20060831), vol. 2006, no. 56, XP002484689 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |