EP3508106 - HANDHELD FLOOR TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states i-mop GmbH Schwanheimer Straße 141 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franke, Rudolf Kurt-Schumacher-Str. 7 64625 Bensheim / DE | 02 /
Kenter, Rainer Am hohen Gstad 10 89312 Günzburg / DE | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 19155564.8 | 25.08.2010 | [2019/28] | Priority number, date | DE20091028944 | 27.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009028944 | [2019/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508106 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3508106 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/40 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
A47L11/305 (EP,US);
A47L11/40 (US);
A47L11/161 (US);
A47L11/4005 (EP,US);
A47L11/4013 (EP,US);
A47L11/4016 (EP,US);
A47L11/4022 (EP,US);
A47L11/4044 (EP,US);
A47L11/4052 (EP,US);
A47L11/4061 (EP,US);
A47L11/4075 (EP,US);
A47L11/4077 (EP,US);
A47L11/4083 (EP,US);
A47L11/4088 (EP,US);
B24B55/12 (EP,US);
B24B7/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HANDGEFÜHRTES BODENBEARBEITUNGSGERÄT | [2019/28] | English: | HANDHELD FLOOR TREATMENT DEVICE | [2019/28] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SOL À GUIDAGE MANUEL | [2019/28] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 19.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.07.2021 | Observations by third parties | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10766222.3 / EP2470055 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2022
21.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Numatic International Limited 2 Knoll Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3SY / GB Opponent's representative CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | 02
21.04.2022
02.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE Diversey, Inc. 1300 Altura Road, Suite 125 Fort Mill, SC 29708 / US Opponent's representative LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | 03
18.05.2022
24.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE 4CleanPro S.R.L. Via Mugellese, 99 50013 Campi Bisenzio (FI) / IT Opponent's representative Manzella & Associati, et al, et al Via dell'Indipendenza, 13 40121 Bologna / IT | [2023/43] |
Former [2022/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2022
21.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Numatic International Limited 2 Knoll Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3SY / GB Opponent's representative CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | ||
02
21.04.2022
02.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE Diversey, Inc. 1300 Altura Road, Suite 125 Fort Mill, SC 29708 / US Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
03
18.05.2022
24.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE 4CleanPro S.R.L. Via Mugellese, 99 50013 Campi Bisenzio (FI) / IT Opponent's representative Manzella & Associati, et al, et al Via dell'Indipendenza, 13 40121 Bologna / IT | |||
Former [2022/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2022
21.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Numatic International Limited 2 Knoll Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3SY / GB Opponent's representative CSY London 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | ||
02
21.04.2022
02.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE Diversey, Inc. 1300 Altura Road, Suite 125 Fort Mill, SC 29708 / US Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
03
18.05.2022
24.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE 4CleanPro S.R.L. Via dei Tigli 20 50013 Campi Bisenzio (FI) / IT Opponent's representative Manzella & Associati, et al, et al Via dell'Indipendenza, 13 40121 Bologna / IT | |||
Former [2022/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2022
21.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Numatic International Limited 2 Knoll Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3SY / GB Opponent's representative CSY London 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | ||
02
21.04.2022
02.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE Diversey, Inc. 1300 Altura Road, Suite 125 Fort Mill, SC 29708 / US Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
Former [2022/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2022
Numatic International Limited 2 Knoll Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3SY / GB Opponent's representative CSY London 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | 02.06.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.10.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | IE | 25.08.2021 | LU | 25.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/24] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | EE | 18.08.2021 | |
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | EE | 18.08.2021 | |
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | HR | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
BG | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3107387 (SAM KATT); | [Y]DE2836248 (GEN SIGNAL CORP); | [X]US4499624 (BLOOME JAMES A [US], et al); | [X]US4570278 (BLOOME JAMES A [US], et al); | [XY]DE3542631 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE]); | [A]US2002023666 (TAWARA HIROTOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2006112513 (TETTEH ALBERT E [US]); | [A]WO2009057934 (AN BONG JU [KR]) | by applicant | EP0560523 | DE19622856 | EP0978249 | DE20302630U | other | DE19622856 | EP0978249 | EP3033984 | Opposition | WO9905955 | EP0978249 | WO2011023169 | US3778860 | US3101505 | WO2004014209 | US2004034953 |