EP3693501 - NEEDLE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oskar Dilo Maschinenfabrik KG Im Hohenend 11 69412 Eberbach / DE | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolff, Ulrich Leininger Str. 6 69412 Eberbach / DE | 02 /
Müller, Jochen Im Hirschacker 18 69412 Eberbach / DE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 19155657.0 | 06.02.2019 | [2020/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693501 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3693501 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D04H18/02, F16H35/00 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
D04H18/02 (EP);
F16H37/0813 (EP);
F16H35/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2020/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NADELMASCHINE | [2020/33] | English: | NEEDLE MACHINE | [2020/33] | French: | AIGUILLETEUSE | [2020/33] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 26.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | GB | 06.02.2023 | IE | 06.02.2023 | LU | 06.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/12] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
GB | 06.02.2023 | ||
IE | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 06.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 31.08.2022 | |
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 31.08.2022 | |
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19615697 (DILO KG MASCHF OSKAR [DE]) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0013] , [0014] *; | [A]DE10239635 (FEHRER TEXTILMASCH [AT]) [A] 1-16 * page 4, lines 24-67 *; | [XI]EP1939343 (ASSELIN THIBEAU [FR]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0036] , [0060] , [0061]; figures 7,8,1 * [I] 4-16; | [A]WO2009127520 (OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 5 *; | [A]WO2011029487 (OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 4, line 27 - page 6, line 3 * | by applicant | EP0892102 | DE102005012265 | - LÜNENSCHLOß; ALBRECHT, Vliesstoffe, Georg Thieme Verlag, (19820000), pages 122 - 129 |