EP3693941 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GUIDING A VEHICLE OCCUPANT TO AN AVAILABLE VEHICLE PARKING SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Geely Automobile Research & Development Co. Ltd. N°. 818, Binhai 2nd Road Hangzhou Bay New District Ningbo 315336 / CN | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSSON, Magnus Oryddalsvägen 15 448 37 FLODA / SE | 02 /
LINDBERG NILSSON, Erik Brunnehagen 28-1302 417 47 Göteborg / SE | [2021/16] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
NILSSON, Magnus Oryddalsvägen 15 448 37 FLODA / SE | ||
02 /
LINDBERG NILSSON, Erik Brunnehagen 28 417 47 Göteborg / SE | |||
Former [2020/33] | 01 /
NILSSON, Magnus Oryddalsvägen 15 448 37 FLODA / SE | ||
02 /
LINDBERG NILSSON, Erik Brunnehagen 58-1301 417 47 GÖTEBORG / SE | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19156080.4 | 07.02.2019 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693941 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/14, G08G1/065 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
G08G1/143 (EP,US);
G01C21/3423 (US);
G01C21/3685 (US);
G08G1/146 (US);
G08G1/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR LEITUNG FAHRZEUGINSASSEN ZU EINER VERFÜGBAREN FAHRZEUGPARKLÜCKE | [2020/33] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GUIDING A VEHICLE OCCUPANT TO AN AVAILABLE VEHICLE PARKING SPACE | [2020/33] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GUIDAGE D'UN OCCUPANT DE VÉHICULE VERS UN ESPACE DE STATIONNEMENT DE VÉHICULE DISPONIBLE | [2020/33] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 05.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008048885 (QUINN JOSEPH P [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 7] , [0 10] , [0 11] , [0 15] - [0021]; figures 1,2; claims 1,7-10 * [I] 6,14; | [A]US2017148324 (HIGH DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |