EP3695914 - DECOILING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS group GmbH Eduard-Schloemann-Straße 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindbüchl, Jörg Ohlerkirchweg 66 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | 02 /
Cmiel, Thomas Ohlerkirchweg 66 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | 03 /
Heßberger, Dirk Ohlerkirchweg 66 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | 04 /
Greuel, Heinz-Willi Ohlerkirchweg 66 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Reuther, Martin Patentanwalt Zehnthofstrasse 9 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/34] | Reuther, Martin Patentanwalt Zehnthofstrasse 9 52349 Düren / DE | Application number, filing date | 19156623.1 | 12.02.2019 | [2020/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3695914 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/20, B21C47/24, B65H49/18 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
B21C47/20 (EP);
B21C47/242 (EP);
B21C47/245 (EP);
B65H49/32 (EP);
B65H63/04 (EP);
B65H67/02 (EP);
B65H2701/36 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2020/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABHASPELVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2020/34] | English: | DECOILING DEVICE AND METHOD | [2020/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉVIDAGE | [2020/34] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 17.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/50] | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2349873 (JOHN LISY) [A] 1-5,21-23 * page 1, column 1, line 55 - page 1, column 2, line 47 * * page 2, column 2, line 12 - line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2437630 (WILLIAMS MORRIS F, et al) [A] 1-5,21-23 * column 5, line 24 - line 55; figure 3 *; | [X]US2575785 (BEAMAN PHINEAS A, et al) [X] 19,20 * column 3, line 5 - line 12 ** column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3137452 (WINDERS ROBERT F) [A] 1-5,21-23 * column 5, line 48 - line 63; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE1954675 (EISEN UND STAHLWALZWERKE ROETZ) [X] 13 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 5, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [XY]US4355526 (MILES JOHN H) [X] 21,22 * column 3, line 47 - line 68 * * column 4, line 13 - line 30; figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 1-5,12,23; | [XDY]DE8704357U (TREFILERIES DE PERIGUEUX) [XD] 13 * page 6, paragraph 6 - page 11, paragraph 1; figures 2,3 * [Y] 1-5,12,23; | [X]EP0446687 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT]) [X] 19,20 * page 3, line 5 - line 11 * * page 3, line 38 - line 41 * * page 4, line 10 - line 34; figures 2-4 *; | [A]FR2661118 (ROZENBLIT SA [FR]) [A] 1-5,21-23 * page 8, line 27 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]US5097688 (TAYLOR TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 1-5,21-23 * column 4, line 3 - line 17; figures 1-3,7 *; | [YA]DE9407477U (HERBORN & BREITENBACH [DE]) [Y] 15,16 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figure 1 * [A] 17,18; | [XAY]EP2374746 (OCN S P A [IT]) [X] 6-9,12,13 * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 51; figures 1,8,26 * [A] 11,14 [Y] 12,15,16 | by applicant | DE8704357U |