EP3508080 - VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/28] | VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS AND METHODS | ||
[2020/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juul Labs International Inc. 560 20th Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2020/20] |
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states Juul Labs UK Holdco Limited Suite 1, 3rd Floor 11 - 12 St. James's Square London SW1Y 4LB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monsees, James 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA California 94107 / US | 02 /
Bowen, Adam 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA California 94107 / US | 03 /
Hatton, Cole 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA California 94107 / US | 04 /
Christensen, Steven 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA California 94107 / US | 05 /
Atkins, Ariel 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA California 94107 / US | 06 /
Lomeli, Kevin 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA California 94107 / US | 07 /
Hibmacronan, Christopher Nicholas 582 6th Street San Francisco, CA California 94103 / US | 08 /
Morenstein, Joshua 582 6th Street San Francisco, CA California 94103 / US | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard, et al Thum & Partner Thum Mötsch Weickert Patentanwälte PartG mbB Siebertstr. 6 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19157414.4 | 23.12.2014 | [2019/28] | Priority number, date | US201361920225P | 23.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361920225 P | US201461936593P | 06.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461936593 P | US201461937755P | 10.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461937755 P | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508080 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3508080 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A61M15/06, H05B1/02, A61M11/04 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/46 (IL,KR);
H05B1/0244 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A24B15/167 (GB,IL);
A24F40/10 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/40 (EP,GB,IL,US);
A24F40/42 (IL,KR,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,IL);
A24F40/51 (IL,KR);
A24F40/53 (EP,IL,KR);
A24F40/57 (IL,KR);
A24F40/95 (IL,KR);
A61M11/042 (EP,GB,IL,US);
A61M15/0015 (EP,IL,US);
A61M15/0016 (EP,IL,US);
A61M15/002 (EP,IL,US);
A61M15/0021 (IL,KR);
H01R13/6205 (GB,IL);
H01R31/06 (GB,IL);
H02J7/00 (IL,US);
H02J7/00309 (EP,GB,IL);
H02J7/0034 (EP,IL,US);
H02J7/0044 (EP,GB,IL,US);
H05B1/0202 (IL,KR);
H05B1/0227 (GB,IL);
H05B3/04 (GB,IL);
H05B3/44 (GB,IL);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2016/0024 (IL,KR);
A61M2205/128 (EP,IL);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/3606 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M2205/8237 (EP,IL,US);
H05B2203/021 (IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] |
Former [2019/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNGSSYSTEME | [2020/51] | English: | VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS | [2020/51] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET DISPOSITIFS DE VAPORISATION | [2020/51] |
Former [2019/28] | VERDAMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2019/28] | VAPORIZATION DEVICE SYSTEMS AND METHODS | ||
Former [2019/28] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DISPOSITIFS DE VAPORISATION | Examination procedure | 04.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 04.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2020 | 17.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14873186.2 / EP3086671 | EP18000692.6 / EP3430921 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2022/33] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 27.01.2021 | |
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | LT | 27.01.2021 | |
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | LT | 27.01.2021 | |
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | LT | 27.01.2021 | |
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 27.01.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2009132793 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-14 * the whole document * [Y] 15 [I] 4; | [A]AT507187 (BUCHBERGER HELMUT DR [AT]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y]WO2012085203 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH], et al) [Y] 15 * page 17, line 22 - page 20, line 16; figures 4-5 *; | [A]WO2013083631 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |