EP3534186 - OPTOELECTRONIC SENSOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COVER PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2020/08] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Sick AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitz, Dr. Stephan Talstr. 135b 79194 Gundelfingen / DE | 02 /
Brender, Tamara Max-Josef-Metzger-Str. 16 79111 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
Brucker, Frank In der Schmelze 24 77716 Haslach / DE | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 19157535.6 | 15.02.2019 | [2019/36] | Priority number, date | DE201810104787 | 02.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018104787 | [2019/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3534186 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/10 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
G01V8/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHER SENSOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE FRONTSCHEIBE | [2019/36] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC SENSOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COVER PLATE | [2019/36] | French: | CAPTEUR OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PARE-BRISE | [2019/36] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1610154 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,11,13 * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * [Y] 5,6,8-10,12,14,15; | [Y]DE102014107353 (SICK AG [DE]) [Y] 5,6,12 * paragraphs [0010] , [0023]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0667109 (LANGENBACH KLAUS [DE]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0021]; figure 3b *; | [Y]DE9113638U (GEB. MERTEN GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004]; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE69130970T (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE102007050097 (BAUMER ELECTRIC AG [CH]) [A] 8,9,14 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * | [Y] - Reinhold Wimberger-Friedl, "Orientation, stress and density distributions in injection-moulded amorphous polymers determined by optical techniques", doi:10.6100/IR364279, (19910101), URL: https://research.tue.nl/files/1962727/364279.pdf, (20190624), XP055599475 [Y] 8,9,14 * pages 127,135 - page 145 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.6100/IR364279 | by applicant | DE19757849 | DE19801632 | DE102006048297 | DE4343457 | EP2722684 | DD277122 |