EP3530518 - VEHICLE AND METHOD OF NOTIFYING CHARGING INFORMATION OF VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSUMI, Hidetoshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 19158675.9 | 21.02.2019 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | JP20180029758 | 22.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018029758 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530518 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/60, B60L58/12 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
B60L53/60 (EP,US);
B60Q9/00 (US);
B60G9/00 (US);
B60L53/62 (US);
B60L53/665 (US);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/70 (CN);
B60L2240/80 (EP,US);
B60L2250/14 (EP,US);
B60L2250/16 (EP,US);
B60L2260/50 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MELDUNG VON ABRECHNUNGSINFORMATIONEN EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2019/35] | English: | VEHICLE AND METHOD OF NOTIFYING CHARGING INFORMATION OF VEHICLE | [2019/35] | French: | VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE NOTIFICATION D'INFORMATIONS DE CHARGEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 14.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011022256 (ASADA HIROSHIGE [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012140752 (YUN HYUN JEONG [KR], et al); | [A]US8648565 (MITSUTANI NORITAKE [JP]); | [A]US2014188367 (NORTH FORREST [US], et al); | [A]US2015314690 (BUIA CHRISTIAN J [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2011050162 |