EP3540674 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE GENERATION OF USER-INITIATED FEDERATED IDENTITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cornèr Banca SA Via Canova 16 6900 Lugano / CH | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marchetto, Jarno Via al Maglio, 2 6952 Canobbio / CH | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Ponzellini, Gianmarco PGA S.P.A., Milano Succursale di Lugano Viale Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 19158722.9 | 22.02.2019 | [2019/38] | Priority number, date | CH20180000305 | 12.03.2018 Original published format: CH 3052018 | [2020/19] |
Former [2019/38] | CH20180000305 | 12.03.2018 | |
IT20180003461 | 12.03.2018 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3540674 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40, G06Q20/38, G06Q30/06 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP);
G06Q20/065 (EP);
G06Q20/223 (EP);
G06Q20/36 (EP);
G06Q20/382 (EP);
G06Q20/3827 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 17.03.2020 | ME | 17.03.2020 | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | 17.03.2020 | MD | 17.03.2020 | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON BENUTZERINITIIERTEN FÖDERIERTEN IDENTITÄTEN | [2019/38] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE GENERATION OF USER-INITIATED FEDERATED IDENTITIES | [2019/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'IDENTITÉS FÉDÉRÉES INITIÉES PAR L'UTILISATEUR | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0002 | 17.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 17.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017251025 (VARLEY MICHAEL [CA], et al) [X] 1,14-16 * paragraphs [0002] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0085] - [0095] * * paragraphs [0099] - [0109] * * paragraphs [0125] - [0130] * * paragraphs [0189] - [0270] * [I] 1-18; | [I]WO2017066715 (CAMBRIDGE BLOCKCHAIN LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * page 1, line 17 - page 3, line 12 * * page 4, line 4 - page 11, line 15 * * page 13, line 28 - page 15, line 4 * * page 33, line 14 - page 34, line 12 *; | [I]WO2017006135 (BARCLAYS BANK PLC [GB]) [I] 1-18 * page 1, line 6 - page 5, line 2 * * page 13, line 1 - page 20, line 2 * * page 9, line 29 - page 11, line 13 *; | [A]WO2017090041 (BEN-ARI ADI [GB]) [A] 1-18 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 19 * * page 9, line 4 - page 11, line 13 * * page 17, lines 1-30 * * page 19, line 25 - page 21, line 20 * |