EP3699648 - INTERFERENCE COATING SYSTEM WITHOUT SUBSTRATE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Turnstrasse 27 73430 Aalen / DE | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON BLANCKENHAGEN, Bernhard Schlossstr. 6/2 73433 Aalen / DE | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 19158947.2 | 22.02.2019 | [2020/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3699648 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/115, B32B43/00, C23C14/00, G02B5/08, G02B5/28, C23C14/24 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
G02B5/285 (EP,US);
C23C14/0005 (EP,US);
C23C14/0031 (EP,US);
C23C14/022 (EP,US);
C23C14/024 (EP,US);
C23C14/083 (EP,US);
C23C14/10 (EP,US);
C23C14/30 (EP,US);
C23C28/04 (EP,US);
C23C28/42 (EP,US);
C23C28/44 (EP,US);
G02B1/115 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERFERENZSCHICHTSYSTEM OHNE TRÄGERSUBSTRAT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2020/35] | English: | INTERFERENCE COATING SYSTEM WITHOUT SUBSTRATE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND ITS USE | [2020/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COUCHE D'INTERFÉRENCE SANS SUBSTRAT SUPPORT, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2020/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE4124937 (O I B GMBH OPTISCHE INTERFEREN [DE]) [X] 1,3-14 * column 1 - column 3; table 1 * [Y] 13-15 [I] 2; | [XYI]US2002171936 (OCKENFUSS GEORG [US], et al) [X] 1,3-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0017] , [ 0036] - [0037] - [ 0043] , [ 0046] - [0051] * [Y] 13-15 [I] 2; | [XY]EP1270683 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12,15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0024] - [ 0037] - [0039] - [ 0045] - [0050] - [ 0053] - [0056] * [Y] 13-15; | [X]US2004070833 (SARGENT ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9-14* paragraph [0037] * | by applicant | US5316791 | EP0950693 | EP2437084 | DE102011083960 | - E.S. GADELMAWLA et al., "Roughness parameters", Journal of Materials Processing Technology, (20020000), vol. 123, doi:doi:10.1016/S0924-0136(02)00060-2, pages 133 - 145, XP002548535 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-0136(02)00060-2 | - OLIVER W.C.; PHARR, G.M., "Measurement of hardness and elastic modulus by instrumented indentation: Advances in understanding and refinements to methodology", J. Mater. Res., (20040100), vol. 19, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1557/jmr.2004.19.1.3, pages 3 - 20, XP008098439 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/jmr.2004.19.1.3 |